This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2020 at 08:15:21 (UTC).

Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London v. WH Healthcare Group, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against WH Healthcare Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger, W. Carleton Metcalf and David Keesler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00039

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judges

W. Carleton Metcalf

David Keesler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London

Defendants

Jeffrey G. Hedges

WH Healthcare Group, LLC

Superior Healthcare Physical Medicine and Rehab, PC

Andrew Wells

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley K Overcash

Attorney at Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein, LLP

Three Wells Fargo Center, 401 South Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Daniel Edward Peterson

Attorney at Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP

401 S. Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Raymond Pellington

Attorney at Redding Jones, PLLC

2907 Providence Road, Suite A303

Charlotte, NC 28211

Stephen Lacy Cash

Attorney at Barbour, Searson, Jones & Cash, PLLC

21 Battery Park Avenue, Suite 201

Asheville, NC 28801

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

18 #2

Exhibit Scheduling Order in Intervention Lawsuit

18 #1

Exhibit Answer in Intervention Lawsuit

#18

#17

#16

15 #1

Affidavit

#11

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Superior Healthcare Physical Medicine and Rehab, PC, WH Healthcare Group, LLC. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 4/9/2020. (reh) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants WH Healthcare Group, LLC and Superior Healthcare Physical Medicine and Rehab, PC by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (Overcash, Bradley) Modified text on 4/7/2020. NEF Regenerated (ejb). (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants WH Healthcare Group, LLC and Superior Healthcare Physical Medicine and Rehab, PC by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (Overcash, Bradley) Modified text on 4/7/2020. NEF Regenerated (ejb). (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Stay and in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice by Andrew Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer in Intervention Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit Scheduling Order in Intervention Lawsuit)(Cash, Stephen) Modified text on 4/6/2020 (ejb). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Stay and in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice by Andrew Wells. Responses due by 4/16/2020 (Cash, Stephen). Motions referred to David Keesler. Added additional relief sought MOTION to Dismiss on 4/6/2020. NEF Regenerated (ejb). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Andrew Wells. (Cash, Stephen). Modified on 4/3/2020- Attachments Deleted. Please see document #18 (Memorandum in Support) for attachments, NEF re-generated (thh). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Defendant WH Healthcare Group, LLC answer due 3/3/2020. Defendant Superior Healthcare Physical Medicine and Rehab, PC answer due 3/4/2020. Defendant Jeffrey G. Hedges answer due 4/17/2020 (per #13 Order). Defendant Andrew Wells answer due 4/3/2020 (per #11 Order). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(Overcash, Bradley) Modified text on 4/2/2020 (ni). (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Docket(#14) ***Docketed in error, please see corrected entry at #15 . Modified on 4/2/2020 (ni). (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Jeffrey G. Hedges to respond to the complaint is extended to 4/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/1/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Jeffrey G. Hedges. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pellington, Joseph). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Jeffrey G. Hedges. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pellington, Joseph). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Raymond Pellington on behalf of Jeffrey G. Hedges (Pellington, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeffrey G. Hedges. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ni) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Magistrate Judge David Keesler as referral judge. Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Edward Peterson on behalf of Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Peterson, Daniel) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#4) **Please disregard. Notice of Appearance by attorney Daniel Edward Peterson provided at DE #5 (kby).** (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeffrey G. Hedges, Superior Healthcare Physical Medicine and Rehab, PC, WH Healthcare Group, LLC, Andrew Wells. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (kby) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kby) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, subscribing to Certificate No. 492300 (Overcash, Bradley) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4379642), filed by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, subscribing to Certificate No. 492300. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy (Cert. No. 492300), #2 Exhibit Intervention Complaint, #3 Exhibit 14 January 2020 Letter)(Overcash, Bradley) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Edward Peterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley K Overcash