This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2022 at 09:17:05 (UTC).

Thorson v. Bank of America, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Thorson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Bank of America, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and Tony N. Leung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-01643

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raechel Thorson

Defendants

Synchrony Bank

Bank of America, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas J Lyons, Jr

Attorney at Consumer Justice Center P.A.

367 Commerce Court

Vadnais Heights, MN 55127

Mark L Vavreck

Attorney at Gonko & Vavreck, PLLC

401 N. Third Street, Suite 640

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Defendant Attorney

Cory D Olson

Attorney at Anthony Ostlund Louwagie Dressen & Boylan P.A.

90 South 7Th Street, Suite 3600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A., Synchrony Bank. (CLK) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raechel Thorson. Synchrony Bank served on 6/28/2022, answer due 7/19/2022. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Raechel Thorson. Bank of America, N.A. waiver sent on 7/6/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for Extension of Time to Respond by Synchrony Bank. Jointly Signed by Raechel Thorson. (Olson, Cory) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Olson, Cory) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Synchrony Bank answer due 8/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/18/2022. (HAM) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Synchrony Bank. (Olson, Cory) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Synchrony Bank. (Olson, Cory) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Synchrony Bank answer due 8/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/18/2022. (HAM) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Olson, Cory) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for Extension of Time to Respond by Synchrony Bank. Jointly Signed by Raechel Thorson. (Olson, Cory) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Raechel Thorson. Bank of America, N.A. waiver sent on 7/6/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raechel Thorson. Synchrony Bank served on 6/28/2022, answer due 7/19/2022. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A., Synchrony Bank. (CLK) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-1643 ECT/TNL.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Bank of America N.A., Synchrony Bank (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9592032) filed by Raechel Thorson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 6/23/2022 (kt). (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant