This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:24:10 (UTC).

Thorsen v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Thorsen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean D. Jordan and Kimberly C Priest Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00898

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

Referral Judge

Kimberly C Priest Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janet Thorsen

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Erwin Alfred Cain

Attorney at Erwin A Cain PC - Dallas

4925 Greenville Ave, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75206

Michael Glynn Lee

Attorney at Erwin A Cain PC - Dallas

4925 Greenville Ave, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 471st Judicial District, case number 471-01668-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7559531), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B Index, #3 Exhibit B, Tab 1 Original Petition, #4 Exhibit B, Tab 2 Citation, #5 Exhibit B, Tab 3 Service Return, #6 Exhibit B, Tab 4 Special Exceptions and Original Answer, #7 Exhibit B, Tab 5 First Amended Original Petition, #8 Exhibit C Information Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cain, Erwin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/6/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit C Information Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A Docket Sheet

2 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B Index

#2

(#2) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** FIRST AMENDED PETITION against Target Corporation, filed by Janet Thorsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(rpc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit B, Tab 4 Special Exceptions and Original Answer

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation. (Cain, Erwin) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit B, Tab 3 Service Return

1 #4

Exhibit B, Tab 2 Citation

#7

(#7) AMENDED ANSWER to First Amended #2 Complaint by Target Corporation. (Lee, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Jennifer Clayton (Plaintiff's attorney) as to #4 Order. (rpc, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/17/2019) (rpc, ). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/9/2019. (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit B, Tab 5 First Amended Original Petition

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED ANSWER to First Amended #2 Complaint by Target Corporation. (Lee, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/6/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Jennifer Clayton (Plaintiff's attorney) as to #4 Order. (rpc, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/17/2019) (rpc, ). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/9/2019. (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation. (Cain, Erwin) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** FIRST AMENDED PETITION against Target Corporation, filed by Janet Thorsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(rpc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotified Plaintiff's Attorneys, Jennifer Clayton, Dan Morales, and R. Eric Lopez, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEYS NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 471st Judicial District, case number 471-01668-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7559531), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B Index, #3 Exhibit B, Tab 1 Original Petition, #4 Exhibit B, Tab 2 Citation, #5 Exhibit B, Tab 3 Service Return, #6 Exhibit B, Tab 4 Special Exceptions and Original Answer, #7 Exhibit B, Tab 5 First Amended Original Petition, #8 Exhibit C Information Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cain, Erwin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less