This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 07:04:09 (UTC).

Thorpe v. Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Thorpe filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth D. Bell and David Keesler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth D. Bell

Referral Judge

David Keesler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carly Buchanan Thorpe

Defendants

Robert Bosch Tool Corporation doing business as Bosch Lincolnton

Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc. doing business as Bosch Lincolnton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Albert Montgomery

Attorney at The Montgomery Law Firm, PLLC

6135 Park South Drive, Suite 510

Charlotte, NC 28210

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Stewart Shade

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

207 Mockingbird Lane, Suite 300, P. O. Box 3038

Johnson City, TN 37602

Andrew H. Stuart

Attorney at Stuart & Johnston, LLC

3343 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 530

Atlanta, GA 30326

Matthew A. Hood

Attorney at Stuart & Johnston, LLC

3535 Peachtree Road, Suite 520-420

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc..(Shade, Jason) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Reason for Delay in Settlement Conference by Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc. (Shade, Jason) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc. (Shade, Jason) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit A

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew H. Stuart for Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc.(Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/19/2022. (kab) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew A. Hood for Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/19/2022. (kab) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Shade, Jason) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#10

(#10) Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Shade, Jason) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#11

(#11) Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: four (4) days. Discovery due by 10/7/2022. Motions due by 12/15/2022. Mediator Designation deadline set for 4/7/2022. Mediation deadline set for 10/7/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/15/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/9/22. (mga) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: four (4) days. Discovery due by 10/7/2022. Motions due by 12/15/2022. Mediator Designation deadline set for 4/7/2022. Mediation deadline set for 10/7/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/15/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/9/22. (mga) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Shade, Jason) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Shade, Jason) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew A. Hood for Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/19/2022. (kab) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew H. Stuart for Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc.(Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/19/2022. (kab) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew A. Hood Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5400005. by Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shade, Jason). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew H. Stuart Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5399966. by Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shade, Jason). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc. (Shade, Jason) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/3/2022. (nvc) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Reason for Delay in Settlement Conference by Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc. (Shade, Jason) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc..(Shade, Jason) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketClerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Lincoln County Superior Court, case number 21CVS01509. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5382717), filed by Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shade, Jason) Modified on 1/7/2022 (rth). (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bosch Automotive Service Solutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Robert Bosch Tool Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew A Hood

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew H Stuart