This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2022 at 09:17:04 (UTC).

Thornton v. Hickey et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 Thornton filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Hickey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Armistead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00972

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey Armistead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Thornton

Baker City, OR 97814-1346

Defendants

Tasha Hickey

Randal

Carter

Bugher

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by James Thornton. (dsg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#2

(#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by James Thornton against Bugher, Carter, Tasha Hickey, Randal. (dsg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/5/2022.) (dsg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by James Thornton. (dsg) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO FILE AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must file an amended application curing the deficiency within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed on 7/14/2022 by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (Deposited order and IFP application in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/14/2022.) (dsg) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#7

(#7) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by James Thornton. (dsg) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TO COLLECT INMATE FILING FEE: Plaintiff's applications to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos. #1 & #7 ) areGRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the Oregon Department of Corrections, Central Trust Unit, shall collect payments from the trust account of Plaintiff and shall forward those payments to the Clerk of the Court. A copy of this order has been emailed to the Central Trust Unit. Signed on 8/3/2022 by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/3/2022.) (dsg) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER TO AMEND: Thornton must file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. The court advises Thornton that the proceeding will be dismissed if he fails to timely file an Amended Complaint. Because Thornton has not established exceptional circumstances at this time, the court denies Thornton's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #5 ). Signed on 8/3/2022 by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/3/2022.) (dsg) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO AMEND: Thornton must file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. The court advises Thornton that the proceeding will be dismissed if he fails to timely file an Amended Complaint. Because Thornton has not established exceptional circumstances at this time, the court denies Thornton's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #5 ). Signed on 8/3/2022 by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/3/2022.) (dsg) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TO COLLECT INMATE FILING FEE: Plaintiff's applications to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos. #1 & #7 ) areGRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the Oregon Department of Corrections, Central Trust Unit, shall collect payments from the trust account of Plaintiff and shall forward those payments to the Clerk of the Court. A copy of this order has been emailed to the Central Trust Unit. Signed on 8/3/2022 by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/3/2022.) (dsg) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by James Thornton. (dsg) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO FILE AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must file an amended application curing the deficiency within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed on 7/14/2022 by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (Deposited order and IFP application in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/14/2022.) (dsg) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by James Thornton. (dsg) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Armistead. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/5/2022.) (dsg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by James Thornton against Bugher, Carter, Tasha Hickey, Randal. (dsg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by James Thornton. (dsg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carter is a litigant