This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/17/2020 at 09:02:17 (UTC).

Thornhill et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 Thornhill filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Russ Walker and Myron H. Thompson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan Russ Walker

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Thornhill

Cindy Thornhill

Defendants

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

State Farm

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darron C. Hendley

Attorney at Law Office of Darron C Hendley

323 Adams Ave

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Michael McCarthy

Attorney at Slocumb Law Firm

145 E. Magnolia Ave., Suite 201

Auburn, AL 36830

Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr.

Attorney at Holtsford Gilliland Higgins Hitson & Howard, PC

Po Box 4128

Montgomery, AL 36103

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Civil Appeals Checklist

#14

(#14) ORDER: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this cause is remanded to the Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL; further ORDERED that plfs' #4 motion to remand is denied as moot, and that any and all other pending motions are left for disposition by the state court after remand; DIRECTING the Clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the remand; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (Certified copies of Order and Docket Sheet mailed to Montgomery County Circuit Court) (amf, ) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#13

(#13) (Joint Stipulation for Remand) Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Cindy Thornill, Robert Thornhill. (Miller, Tracy) Modified on 2/11/2020 to clarify the docket text & to add as also filed on behalf of the Plfs (amf, ). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy T. Miller on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Miller, Tracy) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#11

(#11) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Error re Documents #8 & #9 , which are hereby STRICKEN as clerical error.(amf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#9

(#9) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #10 NOTICE) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Cindy Thornhill & Robert Thornhill. (amf, ) Modified on 1/29/2020 (amf, ). (amf, ). (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#8

(#8) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #10 NOTICE) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (amf, ) Modified on 1/29/2020 (amf, ). (amf, ). (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#4

Motions No Longer Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Walker: #4 MOTION to Remand, #1 - 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment, & #1 - 4 MOTION to Strike. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

1 #9

Exhibit A - Part 4

1 #8

Exhibit A - Part 3

1 #7

Exhibit A - Part 2

1 #6

Exhibit A (State Court Record) - Part 1

1 #4

Response & Objection to Motion for Summary Judgment

1 #3

Motion for Summary Judgment

1 #2

Answer to Complaint

1 #1

State Court Complaint

#1

Motions No Longer Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Walker: #4 MOTION to Remand, #1 - 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment, & #1 - 4 MOTION to Strike. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this cause is remanded to the Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL; further ORDERED that plfs' #4 motion to remand is denied as moot, and that any and all other pending motions are left for disposition by the state court after remand; DIRECTING the Clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the remand; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (Certified copies of Order and Docket Sheet mailed to Montgomery County Circuit Court) (amf, ) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PURSUANT TO THE #13 JOINT STIPULATION - Attorneys Charles Dennis Hughes & Robert Benjamin Reardon added for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint STIPULATION for Dismissal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Cindy Thornhill, Robert Thornhill. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #13 for PDF) (amf, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) (Joint Stipulation for Remand) Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Cindy Thornill, Robert Thornhill. (Miller, Tracy) Modified on 2/11/2020 to clarify the docket text & to add as also filed on behalf of the Plfs (amf, ). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy T. Miller on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Miller, Tracy) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Walker: #4 MOTION to Remand, #1 - 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment, & #1 - 4 MOTION to Strike. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Error re Documents #8 & #9 , which are hereby STRICKEN as clerical error.(amf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #10 NOTICE) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Cindy Thornhill & Robert Thornhill. (amf, ) Modified on 1/29/2020 (amf, ). (amf, ). (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #10 NOTICE) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (amf, ) Modified on 1/29/2020 (amf, ). (amf, ). (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Cindy Thornhill, Robert Thornhill. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 5 for PDF)(amf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to Strike #1 - 3 Affidavit of Cindy Thornhill by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 4 for PDF) (amf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE and OBJECTION to #1 - 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Rule 56(f) MOTION to Continue, and MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Cindy Thornhill filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 4 for PDF) (amf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cindy Thornhill, Robert Thornhill. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 3 for PDF) (amf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 -2 for PDF)(amf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER to #1 - 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 2 for PDF)(amf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Cindy Thornhill, Robert Thornhill. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF)(amf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2019-900358.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602056411) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Answer to Complaint, #3 Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Response & Objection to Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit A (State Court Record) - Part 1, #7 Exhibit A - Part 2, #8 Exhibit A - Part 3, #9 Exhibit A - Part 4, #10 Exhibit A - Part 5, #11 Exhibit A - Part 6, #12 Exhibit A - Part 7, #13 Exhibit A - Part 8, #14 Exhibit B, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Insurance is a litigant