This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2022 at 09:51:19 (UTC).

Thorne v. Crockett et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 Thorne filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Crockett. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Jeffery S. Frensley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00493

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Thorne

Defendants

Thomas Crockett

Landstar Ranger, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen Gressett

Attorney at Schwed, Adams & McGinley, P.A.

50 N. Front Street, Suite 640

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorney

Mary Beth White

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Nashville)

424 Church Street, Suite 2500

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Settlement Resolution by Thomas Crockett, Landstar Ranger, Inc. (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#13

(#13) REPORT of Mediation fled by Mark S. LeVan, Mediator. (***CASE SETTLED***) (bs) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION for attorney Allen Gressett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Thorne. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#10

(#10) RECEIPT #34675066617 in the amount of $150.00 posted by Mark Thorne re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Allen Gressett. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Pending before the Court is the Defendants' Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint. Docket No. #7 . In light of the Parties' agreement to mediate the case on August 15, 2022. The Motion is GRANTED. The Defendants shall have until September 2, 2022 to file any responsive pleadings to the Complaint. The Initial Case Management Conference in this matter is currently scheduled for August 23, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. (Docket No. #4 .) is hereby continued and reset to September 15, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. via telephone. The Parties shall call 1-877-336-1831 at the appointed time, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/20/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

8 #1

Attachment 1 - Certificate of Good Standing

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#9) ORDER: Pending before the Court is the Defendants' Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint. Docket No. #7 . In light of the Parties' agreement to mediate the case on August 15, 2022. The Motion is GRANTED. The Defendants shall have until September 2, 2022 to file any responsive pleadings to the Complaint. The Initial Case Management Conference in this matter is currently scheduled for August 23, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. (Docket No. #4 .) is hereby continued and reset to September 15, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. via telephone. The Parties shall call 1-877-336-1831 at the appointed time, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/20/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#6

(#6) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/29/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#4

(#9) ORDER: Pending before the Court is the Defendants' Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint. Docket No. #7 . In light of the Parties' agreement to mediate the case on August 15, 2022. The Motion is GRANTED. The Defendants shall have until September 2, 2022 to file any responsive pleadings to the Complaint. The Initial Case Management Conference in this matter is currently scheduled for August 23, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. (Docket No. #4 .) is hereby continued and reset to September 15, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. via telephone. The Parties shall call 1-877-336-1831 at the appointed time, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/20/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

1 #3

Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notices to Plaintiff Atty and State Court Clerk

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Settlement Resolution by Thomas Crockett, Landstar Ranger, Inc. (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Mediation fled by Mark S. LeVan, Mediator. (***CASE SETTLED***) (bs) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Allen Gressett to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/01/2022. (lh) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION for attorney Allen Gressett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Thorne. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RECEIPT #34675066617 in the amount of $150.00 posted by Mark Thorne re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Allen Gressett. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketReset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 9/15/2022 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Pending before the Court is the Defendants' Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint. Docket No. #7 . In light of the Parties' agreement to mediate the case on August 15, 2022. The Motion is GRANTED. The Defendants shall have until September 2, 2022 to file any responsive pleadings to the Complaint. The Initial Case Management Conference in this matter is currently scheduled for August 23, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. (Docket No. #4 .) is hereby continued and reset to September 15, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. via telephone. The Parties shall call 1-877-336-1831 at the appointed time, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/20/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether disciplinary proceedings by any disciplinary authority, a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (ln) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling fee for #8 MOTION for attorney Allen Gressett to Appear Pro Hac Vice was received but is being returned due to incorrect amount. (ln) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for attorney Allen Gressett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Mark Thorne. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(ln) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Thomas Crockett, Landstar Ranger, Inc. (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/29/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Allen Gressett: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 7/19/2022. (ln) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Allen Gressett not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (ln) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/23/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Beth White admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Landstar Ranger, Inc. from Humphreys County Circuit Court, case number 10477. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ATNMDC-3619233). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notices to Plaintiff Atty and State Court Clerk, #3 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDSTAR RANGER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Beth White