This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2021 at 11:49:28 (UTC).

Thornburg v. Tantum Companies, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Thornburg filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Tantum Companies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tom S. Lee and Robert P. Myers, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00805

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tom S. Lee

Referral Judge

Robert P. Myers, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ric Thornburg

Defendant

Tantum Companies, LLC doing business as Back Yard Burgers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Farrell

Attorney at MIKE FARRELL, PLLC

Regions Plaza, Suite 1088, 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Peyton Smith

Attorney at FORMAN WATKINS & KRUTZ, LLP - Jackson

P.O. Box 22608, 210 E. Capitol St., Suite 2200 (39201-2375)

Jackson, MS 39225-2608

Joshua J. Metcalf

Attorney at FORMAN WATKINS & KRUTZ, LLP - Jackson

P.O. Box 22608, 210 E. Capitol St., Suite 2200 (39201-2375)

Jackson, MS 39225-2608

Molly H. McNair

Attorney at FORMAN WATKINS & KRUTZ, LLP - Jackson

P.O. Box 22608, 210 E. Capitol St., Suite 2200 (39201-2375)

Jackson, MS 39225-2608

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 2/9/21 (PKM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tantum Companies, LLC, filed by Ric Thornburg.(Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Tantum Companies, LLC (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Tantum Companies, LLC (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tantum Companies, LLC (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua J. Metcalf on behalf of Tantum Companies, LLC (Metcalf, Joshua) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly H. McNair on behalf of Tantum Companies, LLC (McNair, Molly) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by Tantum Companies, LLC (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Tantum Companies, LLC. (MGB) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Tantum Companies, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 34643061799), filed by Ric Thornburg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 2/9/21 (PKM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tantum Companies, LLC, filed by Ric Thornburg.(Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Tantum Companies, LLC (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Tantum Companies, LLC (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tantum Companies, LLC (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua J. Metcalf on behalf of Tantum Companies, LLC (Metcalf, Joshua) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline: Responsive pleading due by 2/1/2021. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 1/6/2021 (SR) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly H. McNair on behalf of Tantum Companies, LLC (McNair, Molly) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by Tantum Companies, LLC (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Tantum Companies, LLC. (MGB) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tantum Companies, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 34643061799), filed by Ric Thornburg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Peyton Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua James Metcalf