This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:36:53 (UTC).

Thomson Philippi v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Thomson Philippi filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald E. Bush and David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00482

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ronald E. Bush

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dawn Sunshine Thomson Philippi

Respondent

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brad D Parkinson

Attorney at PETERSEN PARKINSON and ARNOLD

Po Box 1645

Idaho Falls, ID 83403-1645

Respondent Attorney

Joanne P Rodriguez

Attorney at United States Attorney's office

1290 West Myrtle Street, Suite 500

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: ALL MATTERS in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Judge Bush is directed to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. If the matter is a non-dispositive motion, Judge Bush is directed to enter an appropriate order as to disposition. If the matter is a dispositive motion, Judge Bush may conduct any hearings, including evidentiary hearings and submit to the United States District Court proposed findings of fact and recommendations as to disposition. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING IFP STATUS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER of Conditional Filing (ckh)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: ALL MATTERS in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Judge Bush is directed to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. If the matter is a non-dispositive motion, Judge Bush is directed to enter an appropriate order as to disposition. If the matter is a dispositive motion, Judge Bush may conduct any hearings, including evidentiary hearings and submit to the United States District Court proposed findings of fact and recommendations as to disposition. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rodriguez, Joanne)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 4:20-cv-00482-DCN. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketThe 21 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Sunshine Thomson Philippi. Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/2/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Parkinson, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 US Attorney General Summons, #2 US Attorney's Office Summons) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING IFP STATUS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Dawn Sunshine Thomson Philippi re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/4/2020. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER of Conditional Filing (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Social Security Number by Dawn Sunshine Thomson Philippi This is a sealed document.. (Parkinson, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Brad D Parkinson appearing for Petitioner Dawn Sunshine Thomson Philippi. Responses due by 11/3/2020 (Parkinson, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Dawn Sunshine Thomson Philippi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Parkinson, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less