This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2022 at 08:26:33 (UTC).

Thompson v. XTO Energy, Inc

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Thompson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against XTO Energy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vacant Judgeship (2022). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00784

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vacant Judgeship (2022)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Thompson

Defendant

XTO Energy, Inc

Intervenor Defendant

RUSCO Operating, LLC

1000 N. West Street, Suite 1501

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Sue L. Robinson

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer C. Bebko Jauffret

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christine Dealy Haynes

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger

920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Felicity A. Fowler

Katelyn W. McCombs

Sarah Miley

Intervenor Defendant Attorney

Laurence V. Cronin

Attorney at Smith, Katzenstein, & Jenkins LLP

1000 West Street, Suite 1501

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Scott Thompson (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#18

(#18) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by XTO Energy, Inc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/2/2022. (Jauffret, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Workrise Technologies Inc. for RUSCO Operating, LLC filed by RUSCO Operating, LLC. (Cronin, Laurence) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

15 #2

Exhibit 2

14 #2

Exhibit A

14 #1

Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Dealy Haynes on behalf of XTO Energy, Inc (Haynes, Christine) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer C. Bebko Jauffret on behalf of XTO Energy, Inc (Jauffret, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#6

(#6) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Thompson. XTO Energy, Inc served on 6/14/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to XTO Energy, Inc on 6/14/2022. (smg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (etg) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Scott Thompson (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by XTO Energy, Inc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/2/2022. (Jauffret, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by XTO Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jauffret, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Workrise Technologies Inc. for RUSCO Operating, LLC filed by RUSCO Operating, LLC. (Cronin, Laurence) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Intervene Under Rule 24 filed by RUSCO Operating, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - 6, #4 Certificate of Compliance)(Cronin, Laurence) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Intervene Under Rule 24 - filed by RUSCO Operating, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Cronin, Laurence) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Sarah Miley for XTO Energy, Inc added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Felicity A. Fowler for XTO Energy, Inc added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Josephson, Andrew W. Dunlap, and Alyssa J. White filed by Scott Thompson. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/8/2022. (etg) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David B. Jordan, Sarah J. Miley and Katelyn W. McCombs of Littler Mendelson, P.C. - filed by XTO Energy, Inc. (Jauffret, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Dealy Haynes on behalf of XTO Energy, Inc (Haynes, Christine) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer C. Bebko Jauffret on behalf of XTO Energy, Inc (Jauffret, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Docket(#5) ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 6/15/2022. (ntl) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Thompson. XTO Energy, Inc served on 6/14/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to XTO Energy, Inc on 6/14/2022. (smg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against XTO Energy, Inc ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3895047.) - filed by Scott Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RUSCO OPERATING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where XTO Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurence V. Cronin(Designation Retained)