This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:48:57 (UTC).

Thompson v. Varga et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Thompson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Varga. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip G. Reinhard and Iain D. Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-50118

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip G. Reinhard

Referral Judge

Iain D. Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mychal Thompson

Dixon, IL 61021

Defendants

Dixon Medical Staff

Steve Meeks

Hanahan

Amber Allen

John Does

Defendants Changing Medicine For Good

Wortham

Wexford Health Service Inc.

James Martens

Mark Hale

John Varga

Chattic

Brandi Hendrix

Thielen

Remmers

Coy

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Mychal Thompson For Service Of Process At Government Expense (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#9

(#9) LETTER from Mychal Thompson dated 5/10/19. (pg, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#10

(#10) LETTER from Mychal Thompson dated 6/20/19. (pg, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#4

(#4) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Mychal Thompson (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: Plaintiffs application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (1) submit a renewed application that is signed by him, certified by an appropriate official, and accompanied by a copy of plaintiffs trust fund statements showing activity in his account or accounts for the entire six-month period immediately preceding his initiation of this action; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by June 21, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and for want of prosecution. Plaintiffs motion for service of process at government expense #3 is denied without prejudice to renewal should this case proceed past screening. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 5/21/2019:mailed notice(pg, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 3 copies by Mychal Thompson (pg, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2019: #1 Envelope) (pg, ). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE Of Filing by Mychal Thompson (pg, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Mychal Thompson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#8

(#8) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Mychal Thompson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER: Plaintiffs renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #8 is denied. Plaintiff must pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Plaintiff may pay by check or money order made payable to Clerk, United States District Court. Per plaintiffs request #10 , his family may send a partial payment for him, but he should be aware that this case will not proceed to screening unless or until the court receives the full filing fee. If plaintiffs family sends the fee or any portion of the fee, they must include on the check or money order: plaintiffs name, his inmate identification number, case no. 19 C 50118, and prisoner installment payment. Failure to remit payment in full by August 2, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 7/2/2019:mailed notice(pg, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: Plaintiffs renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #8 is denied. Plaintiff must pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Plaintiff may pay by check or money order made payable to Clerk, United States District Court. Per plaintiffs request #10 , his family may send a partial payment for him, but he should be aware that this case will not proceed to screening unless or until the court receives the full filing fee. If plaintiffs family sends the fee or any portion of the fee, they must include on the check or money order: plaintiffs name, his inmate identification number, case no. 19 C 50118, and prisoner installment payment. Failure to remit payment in full by August 2, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 7/2/2019:mailed notice(pg, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER from Mychal Thompson dated 6/20/19. (pg, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) LETTER from Mychal Thompson dated 5/10/19. (pg, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Mychal Thompson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE Of Filing by Mychal Thompson (pg, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Sent plaintiff blank I.F.P. form and copy of 5/21/19 Order. (pg, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: Plaintiffs application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (1) submit a renewed application that is signed by him, certified by an appropriate official, and accompanied by a copy of plaintiffs trust fund statements showing activity in his account or accounts for the entire six-month period immediately preceding his initiation of this action; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by June 21, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and for want of prosecution. Plaintiffs motion for service of process at government expense #3 is denied without prejudice to renewal should this case proceed past screening. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 5/21/2019:mailed notice(pg, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Mychal Thompson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Mychal Thompson (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Mychal Thompson For Service Of Process At Government Expense (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 3 copies by Mychal Thompson (pg, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2019: #1 Envelope) (pg, ). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less