This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:25:12 (UTC).

Thompson v. The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Stop Shop Supermarket Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven M. Gold and Rachel P. Kovner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00093

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven M. Gold

Presiding Judge

Rachel P. Kovner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catalina E Thompson

Defendant

The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mari Milorava-Kelman

Attorney at Cherny & Podolsky PLLC

2681 East 14Th Street

Brooklyn, NY 11235

Defendant Attorneys

Jerome Cochran Chapman, IV

Attorney at Torino & Bernstein, P.C.

200 Old Country Road, Ste 220

Mineola, NY 11501

Christine M. Capitolo

Attorney at Torino & Bernstein, P.C.

200 Old Country Road

Mineola, NY 11501

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit B-Pltf Responses

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC (Capitolo, Christine) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A- plaintiff S&C

6 #1

Chamber's Individual Rules

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on April 3, 2020 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for defendant is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with plaintiff's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome Cochran Chapman, IV on behalf of The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC (aty to be noticed) (Chapman, Jerome) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 515423/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12220541) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- plaintiff S&C, #2 Exhibit B-Pltf Responses, #3 Exhibit C-Removal from State Court) (Capitolo, Christine) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C-Removal from State Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on April 3, 2020 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for defendant is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with plaintiff's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome Cochran Chapman, IV on behalf of The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC (aty to be noticed) (Chapman, Jerome) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC (Capitolo, Christine) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 515423/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12220541) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- plaintiff S&C, #2 Exhibit B-Pltf Responses, #3 Exhibit C-Removal from State Court) (Capitolo, Christine) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.