This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2020 at 10:30:20 (UTC).

Thompson v. Sexton et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Thompson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Sexton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Norman K. Moon, Joel C. Hoppe and Michael F. Urbanski. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00454

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel C. Hoppe

Presiding Judges

Norman K. Moon

Michael F. Urbanski

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul C. Thompson, Jr.

Pound, VA 24279

Defendants

C/O Sexton

C/O B. M. Begley

C/O Walker

C/O Z. Mannon

Unknown C/O

Commonwealth of Virginia

Warden Kiser

C/O Dotson

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Norman K. Moon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)

#8

(#8) Order for Plaintiff to Respond with a signed consent to fee form within 20 days Responses due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/17/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)

7 #1

Cover Letter

#7

(#7) Unsigned - Consent to Fee form filed by Paul C. Thompson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(tvt)

5 #1

Cover Letter

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Paul C. Thompson, Jr.. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aab)

#4

(#4) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/1/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/6/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

1 #1

719cv00393-Order severing

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against B. M. Begley, Commonwealth of Virginia, Dotson, Kiser, Z. Mannon, Sexton, Unknown C/O, Walker, filed by Paul C. Thompson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 719cv00393-Order severing as to Claim 5)(slt)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Norman K. Moon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order for Plaintiff to Respond with a signed consent to fee form within 20 days Responses due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/17/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unsigned - Consent to Fee form filed by Paul C. Thompson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#6) Oral ORDER-This case has been conditionally filed, and plaintiff has sought an extension of time to file an amended complaint. At this time, no amended complaint is due from him in this case; accordingly, no extension is necessary. To the extent that Thompson's motion could be construed as asking for additional time to provide his consent-to-fee form, his motion (Dkt. No. 5) is GRANTED. Thompson shall have until October 9, 2020, to comply with the court's September 1, 2020 order (Dkt. No. 4) and submit his consent-to-fee form. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/9/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Paul C. Thompson, Jr.. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/1/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prisoner Trust Account Report by Paul C. Thompson, Jr. (tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/6/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against B. M. Begley, Commonwealth of Virginia, Dotson, Kiser, Z. Mannon, Sexton, Unknown C/O, Walker, filed by Paul C. Thompson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 719cv00393-Order severing as to Claim 5)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less