This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2020 at 08:06:14 (UTC).

Thompson v. Saul

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 Thompson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Omar J. Aboulhosn and Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00280

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Omar J. Aboulhosn

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lora E. Thompson

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James T. Meisel

Attorney at J.T. MEISEL ATTORNEY AT LAW

640 Fifth Avenue

Huntington, WV 25701

Defendant Attorney

Nora R. Koch

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

6Th Floor, 300 Spring Garden Street

Philadelphia, PA 19123

 

Court Documents

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

(#5) ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing that the Clerk of the Court issue the summons(es); directing that the Plaintiff shall serve the summons(es) and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs taxed against plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and plaintiff's attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 4/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (hkl)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS granting Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing that the Clerk of the Court issue the summons(es); directing that the Plaintiff shall serve the summons(es) and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; further directing that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs taxed against plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and plaintiff's attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 4/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Lora E. Thompson for Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION by Lora E. Thompson to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order) (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less