This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2023 at 07:54:35 (UTC).

Thompson v. Resurgence Legal Group, PC et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Thompson filed an Other lawsuit against Resurgence Legal Group, PC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy L. Maldonado. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06580

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy L. Maldonado

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valerie Ann Thompson

Defendants

Resurgence Legal Group, PC

Palisades Collection L.L.C.

Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel A. Edelman

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC

20 S. Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Dulijaza Clark

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Julia Ozello

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner, And Goodwin Llc

20 S Clark St, Ste 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Todd Philip Stelter

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Stacie Elaine Barhorst

Attorney at Bruning & Associates, P.C.

2 N. Riverside Plz., Ste. 1830

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: This case has been reassigned to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado for all further proceedings. Regarding Plaintiff's pending motion for remand #20 , the parties shall email an agreed-upon briefing schedule to the Court's courtroom deputy for consideration. The Court notes, based on its initial review of Plaintiff's motion, that Plaintiff is correct that it is Defendants' burden, as the parties seeking removal, to establish that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction, which includes establishing that Plaintiff has Article III standing. Defendants' response brief must demonstrate that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction and that Plaintiff has Article III standing, not-withstanding their contrary suggestions in their answers. The Court cautions Defendants that if they fail to establish standing and jurisdiction, the Court must remand the matter and may award fees for improper removal. (ca, ) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#25

(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status and motion hearing set for 1/5/23 are stricken as this case is set to be reassigned. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#26

(#26) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado for all further proceedings. Honorable Jorge L. Alonso no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/4/2023. (rp, ) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#24

(#24) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC (Barhorst, Stacie) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#23

(#23) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Palisades Collection L.L.C. AMENDED (Barhorst, Stacie) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#22

(#22) STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Valerie Ann Thompson (Ozello, Julia) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A. Edelman for presentment of motion to remand #20 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/5/2023 at 09:30 AM. (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#20

(#20) MOTION by Plaintiff Valerie Ann Thompson to remand and for Attorney's Fees (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#19

(#19) ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Valerie Ann Thompson by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION by Defendant Resurgence Legal Group, PC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead until December 19, 2022 [UNOPPOSED] (Stelter, Todd) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Resurgence Legal Group, PC by Todd Philip Stelter (Stelter, Todd) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#3

(#3) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (cxr, ) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Resurgence Legal Group, PC by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: This case has been reassigned to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado for all further proceedings. Regarding Plaintiff's pending motion for remand #20 , the parties shall email an agreed-upon briefing schedule to the Court's courtroom deputy for consideration. The Court notes, based on its initial review of Plaintiff's motion, that Plaintiff is correct that it is Defendants' burden, as the parties seeking removal, to establish that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction, which includes establishing that Plaintiff has Article III standing. Defendants' response brief must demonstrate that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction and that Plaintiff has Article III standing, not-withstanding their contrary suggestions in their answers. The Court cautions Defendants that if they fail to establish standing and jurisdiction, the Court must remand the matter and may award fees for improper removal. (ca, ) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status and motion hearing set for 1/5/23 are stricken as this case is set to be reassigned. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado for all further proceedings. Honorable Jorge L. Alonso no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/4/2023. (rp, ) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC (Barhorst, Stacie) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Palisades Collection L.L.C. AMENDED (Barhorst, Stacie) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Valerie Ann Thompson (Ozello, Julia) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A. Edelman for presentment of motion to remand #20 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/5/2023 at 09:30 AM. (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION by Plaintiff Valerie Ann Thompson to remand and for Attorney's Fees (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to Complaint by Palisades Acquisition XVI, LLC, Palisades Collection L.L.C.(Barhorst, Stacie) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Valerie Ann Thompson by Julia Ozello (Ozello, Julia) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Valerie Ann Thompson by Dulijaza Clark (Clark, Dulijaza) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Valerie Ann Thompson by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Defendant Resurgence Legal Group, PC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead until December 19, 2022 [UNOPPOSED] (Stelter, Todd) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Resurgence Legal Group, PC by Todd Philip Stelter (Stelter, Todd) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cxr, ) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (cxr, ) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Resurgence Legal Group, PC by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, ) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Notice of Removal) filed by Resurgence Legal Group, PC; n. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20076587. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stelter, Todd) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less