This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:34:00 (UTC).

Thompson v. Regions Security Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Thompson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Regions Security Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lurana S. Snow and William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-62152

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Thompson

Defendant

Regions Security Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Scott Norell

Attorney at Robert S. Norell P.A.

300 Nw 70Th Avenue, Suite 305

Plantation, FL 33317

Defendant Attorney

Anthony Sanchez

Attorney at Anthony F. Sanchez, P.A.

6701 Sunset Drive, Suite 101

Miami, FL 33143

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Regions Security Services, Inc.. (Sanchez, Anthony) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER Setting Trial Date & Discovery Deadlines, Referring Case To Mediation & Referring Discovery Motions To United States Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 1/24/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 1/21/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/21/2020)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by David Thompson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norell, Robert) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by David Thompson. Replies due by 12/21/2020. (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#7

(#7) Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Regions Security Services, Inc.. (Sanchez, Anthony) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#6

(#6) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Regions Security Services, Inc.. Attorney Anthony Sanchez added to party Regions Security Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (Sanchez, Anthony) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report And Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES IN FLSA CASES. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Regions Security Services, Inc.. (kpe) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Regions Security Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13747615, filed by David Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Norell, Robert) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Regions Security Services, Inc.. (Sanchez, Anthony) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Setting Trial Date & Discovery Deadlines, Referring Case To Mediation & Referring Discovery Motions To United States Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 1/24/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 1/21/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by David Thompson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norell, Robert) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by David Thompson. Replies due by 12/21/2020. (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Regions Security Services, Inc.. (Sanchez, Anthony) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Regions Security Services, Inc.. Attorney Anthony Sanchez added to party Regions Security Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (Sanchez, Anthony) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report And Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES IN FLSA CASES. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Regions Security Services, Inc.. (kpe) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Regions Security Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13747615, filed by David Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Norell, Robert) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less