This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 09:37:11 (UTC).

Thompson v. Purpose Driven Co LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Purpose Driven Co LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01652

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nita Thompson

Defendants

Purpose Driven Co LLC

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adewale Shamusideen Odetunde, JR

Shelly Greco

Rachel Hatten Adams

Defendant Attorneys

David L Sargent

Mitchell R Pourahmadi

 

Court Documents

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Motion to Substitute Counsel

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit(s)

1 #3

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS ORDERED that Rachel Hatten Adams of Witherite Law Group, PLLC is designated as counsel for Plaintiff Nita Thompson in place of Adewale Odetunde, formerly of Witherite Law Group, PLLC. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/7/2021) (mjr) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Adewale Odetunde filed by Nita Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Motion to Substitute Counsel) (Hatten Adams, Rachel) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial for a one week docket beginning 10/17/2022 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2021) (ndt) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Nita Thompson. (Odetunde, Adewale) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/19/2021) (mla) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, see document #1 for image, by Purpose Driven Co LLC. (mla) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Purpose Driven Co., LLC. (Sargent, David) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Purpose Driven Co., LLC (Sargent, David) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing of Removal filed by Purpose Driven Co., LLC (Sargent, David) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Purpose Driven Co., LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12057572) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Sargent, David) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less