This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2020 at 08:39:29 (UTC).

Thompson v. Pope Resources et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Thompson filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Pope Resources. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00432

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Thompson

Defendants

Pope Resources

William R. Brown

John E. Conlin

Maria M. Pope

Pope MGP, Inc.

Pacific GP Merger Sub II, LLC

Thomas M. Ringo

Pope EGP, Inc.

Pacific LP Merger Sub III, LLC

Pacific GP Merger Sub I, LLC

Rayonier Inc.

Rayonier Operating Company LLC

Sandy D. McDade

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D. Long

Gina M. Serra

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Certification of Plaintiff

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

04/30/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCASE CLOSED per D.I. #3 . (dlw) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Thompson (Long, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2020

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2020

DocketNo Summons Issued. (mal) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 - filed with Jury Demand against William R. Brown, John E. Conlin, Sandy D. McDade, Pacific GP Merger Sub I, LLC, Pacific GP Merger Sub II, LLC, Pacific LP Merger Sub III, LLC, Maria M. Pope, Pope EGP, Inc., Pope MGP, Inc., Pope Resources, Rayonier Inc., Rayonier Operating Company LLC, Thomas M. Ringo - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2887006.) - filed by John Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less