Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2020 at 08:22:50 (UTC).

Thompson v. Perry

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Thompson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Perry. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Jon A. York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01264

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Victor Thompson

Whiteville, TN 38075

Respondent

Grady Perry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Michael Matthew Stahl

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, Federal Habeas Corpus Division, P.O. Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202

 

Court Documents

11 #2

judge's card

11 #1

*Restricted*

#11

(#11) Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00618. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019: #2 judge's card) (mbm). (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER: Based on the above information, particularly the report of Petitioner's average monthly account balance, the application for leave to proceed IFP (Doc. No. 8) is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee, Eastern Division. In light of the foregoing, Petitioner's pending motions to ascertain status (Doc. Nos. 4 & 9) are GRANTED, and his motion for extension of time (Doc. No. 7) is DENIED as moot. His pending motion to appoint counsel (Doc. No. 5) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal before the transferee court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/13/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Receive Status Update and NOTICE of Reporting to the Court filed by Victor Thompson. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#8

(#8) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Victor Thompson. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee or File IFP filed by Victor Thompson. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a blank IFP application form. Petitioner's submission of either the filing fee or an IFP application must be RECEIVED in this Court within 28 days of the date this Order is entered on the docket and must include the docket number assigned to this case, No. 3:19-cv-00618. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/19/2019. (xc: Order and blank IFP to pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) Modified on 8/19/2019 (jw). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Notice of Change of Address filed by Victor Thompson. Address changed at DE #4. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Receive Status Update and NOTICE of Change of Address by Victor Thompson. Address updated on docket sheet. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Matthew Stahl on behalf of Grady Perry (Stahl, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (as) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 07/24/2019)

1 #3

Attachment Self Addressed Envelope

1 #2

Attachment Supplemental Documents

1 #1

Attachment Cover Letter

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Victor Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Supplemental Documents, #3 Self Addressed Envelope)(as) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 07/24/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • (#12) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00618. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019: #2 judge's card) (mbm). (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Based on the above information, particularly the report of Petitioner's average monthly account balance, the application for leave to proceed IFP (Doc. No. 8) is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee, Eastern Division. In light of the foregoing, Petitioner's pending motions to ascertain status (Doc. Nos. 4 & 9) are GRANTED, and his motion for extension of time (Doc. No. 7) is DENIED as moot. His pending motion to appoint counsel (Doc. No. 5) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal before the transferee court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/13/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Receive Status Update and NOTICE of Reporting to the Court filed by Victor Thompson. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Victor Thompson. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee or File IFP filed by Victor Thompson. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a blank IFP application form. Petitioner's submission of either the filing fee or an IFP application must be RECEIVED in this Court within 28 days of the date this Order is entered on the docket and must include the docket number assigned to this case, No. 3:19-cv-00618. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/19/2019. (xc: Order and blank IFP to pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) Modified on 8/19/2019 (jw). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Notice of Change of Address filed by Victor Thompson. Address changed at DE #4. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Receive Status Update and NOTICE of Change of Address by Victor Thompson. Address updated on docket sheet. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Matthew Stahl. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Matthew Stahl on behalf of Grady Perry (Stahl, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (as) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (as) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Victor Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Supplemental Documents, #3 Self Addressed Envelope)(as) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Matthew Stahl