This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2021 at 08:50:55 (UTC).

Thompson v. Nestle Waters North America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Nestle Waters North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony P. Patti and Sean F. Cox. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-11054

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

Presiding Judge

Sean F. Cox

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cleopatra Thompson

Defendants

Nestle Waters North America, Inc.

Sam's East, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas W. Waun

10683 S. Saginaw Street, Suite D

Grand Blanc, MI 48439

Michael A. Kowalko

Attorney at Edwin W. Jakeway Assoc.

Grand Blanc, Mi 48439

Grand Blanc, MI 48439

Defendant Attorneys

Nolan John Moody

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC

123 W. Allegan Street, Suite 900

Lansing, MI 48933-1739

Nicole M. Wright

Attorney at Zausmer, P.C.

32255 Northwestern Highway, Suite #225

Farmington Hills, MI 48334-1574

Maureen J Moody

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC

123 W. Allegan Street, Suite 900

Lansing, MI 48933-1816

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sam's East, Inc. (Moody, Nolan) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#9

(#9) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Nestle Waters North America, Inc. (Moody, Nolan) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Opinions

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Opinions) (Moody, Nolan) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER Denying Without Prejudice as Moot #2 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

6 #3

Exhibit 3

6 #2

Exhibit 2

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Kowalko, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of counsel. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (DPer) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sam's East, Inc., Nestle Waters North America, Inc. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants (Moody, Nolan) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

2 #5

Exhibit 4

2 #4

Exhibit 3

2 #3

Exhibit 2

2 #2

Exhibit 1

2 #1

Index of Exhibits

#2

(#2) MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Moody, Nolan) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sam's East, Inc. (Moody, Nolan) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Nestle Waters North America, Inc. (Moody, Nolan) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Opinions) (Moody, Nolan) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Denying Without Prejudice as Moot #2 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Kowalko, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of counsel. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (DPer) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sam's East, Inc., Nestle Waters North America, Inc. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants (Moody, Nolan) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Moody, Nolan) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's East, Inc. from Genesee County Circuit Court, case number 21-115461-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8455960 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal, #4 Exhibit C - Letter to Plaintiff's Attorney dated 04/19/21 with proposed Stipulated Order Capping Damages, #5 Exhibit D - Email from Plaintiff's Attorney dated 04/19/21) (Wright, Nicole) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sam's East, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nestle Waters North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nolan John Moody

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maureen J Moody