This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 08:17:18 (UTC).

Thompson v. Lugo et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lugo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01578

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia Ann Thompson

Defendants

Richard Lugo

Walmart, Inc.

Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jie Amy Sun

6145 Spring Mountain Rd, Ste 201

Las Vegas, NV 89146

Robert W. Curtis

Attorney at Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright

801 South Rancho Drive, Suite D-4

Las Vegas, NV 89106

Robert D. Vannah

Attorney at Vannah & Vannah

400 S. Seventh St., Ste. 400

Las Vegas, NV 89101

John B. Greene

Attorney at Vannah & Vannah

400 S. Seventh Street, Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Jamieson N. Poe

Attorney at Larson & Stephens

810 S. Casino Center Blvd., Ste. 104

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Bruce Scott Dickinson

Attorney at Stephenson & Dickinson

2820 West Charleston Blvd., Suite 17

Las Vegas, NV 89102

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 10/7/2021. Motions due by 11/8/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#16

(#16) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re 15 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, Minute Order,, by Defendants Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Robert D. Vannah and John B. Greene for Cynthia Ann Thompson substituted for Attorneys Robert W. Curtis and Jie Amy Sun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/13/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#13

(#13) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC. (Dickinson, Bruce) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cynthia Ann Thompson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Greene, John) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Substitute Attorney NOTICE of Substitution of Attorneys by Cynthia Ann Thompson. (Greene, John) Modified event in accordance with the local rules on 9/24/2020 (EDS). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#9

(#9) AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.(Dickinson, Bruce) Modified text on 9/22/2020 (EDS). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/31/2020.(Dickinson, Bruce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#7

(#7) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/25/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/9/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dickinson, Bruce) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-817031-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6142392) by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dickinson, Bruce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/25/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 10/7/2021. Motions due by 11/8/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re 15 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, Minute Order,, by Defendants Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/19/2020. ORDER denying #13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order is denied without prejudice as they do not provide sufficient good cause to warrant extending the dates into 2022. The parties shall review the amended Local Rules and shall file a compliant plan with ample good cause for any special scheduling review within 7 days. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Robert D. Vannah and John B. Greene for Cynthia Ann Thompson substituted for Attorneys Robert W. Curtis and Jie Amy Sun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/13/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC. (Dickinson, Bruce) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cynthia Ann Thompson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Greene, John) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Substitute Attorney NOTICE of Substitution of Attorneys by Cynthia Ann Thompson. (Greene, John) Modified event in accordance with the local rules on 9/24/2020 (EDS). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.(Dickinson, Bruce) Modified text on 9/22/2020 (EDS). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/31/2020.(Dickinson, Bruce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE to 5 Minute Order,,,,, by Defendants Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/26/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants show cause as to why the Court should not remand this action to Clark County District Court for failure to satisfy the diversity jurisdiction requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1332. Specifically, Defendant Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC must provide the citizenships of each of its members, and if any of those members are themselves limited liability companies, partnerships, or other types of unincorporated associations, Defendant must provide their citizenships as well. See Johnson v. Colombia Props. Anchorage, LP, 437 F.3d 894, 899 (9th Cir. 2006) ("[L]ike a partnership, an LLC is a citizen of every state of which its owners/members are citizens."). Defendants shall have until September 4, 2020, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, demonstrating that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being remanded to Clark County District Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to address the jurisdictional issues implicated by this Order, Plaintiff shall have until September 4, 2020, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, discussing the concerns herein raised.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ME) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/25/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/9/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dickinson, Bruce) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-817031-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6142392) by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dickinson, Bruce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less