This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 08:34:47 (UTC).

Thompson v. Illinois Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Thompson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Illinois Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen P. McGlynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00436

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen P. McGlynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Thompson

Menard, IL 62259

Defendants

Illinois Department of Corrections

Rob Jeffreys

Kimberly Martin

Angela Crain

Anthony Willis

Wexford Health Sources Inc.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Dennis Thompson.(kare) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 22-436-SPM. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $402.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 3/4/2022. (kare) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 03/04/2022. Consent due by 3/25/2022 (kare) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Thompson. (kare) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

(#7) WITHDRAWN-MOTION for Leave to Brief the Court by Dennis Thompson. (kare) Modified on 4/19/2022 (jlrr). (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Strike #7 MOTION for Leave to File by Dennis Thompson. (kare) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff has informed the Court that he wishes to withdraw the #7 motion for leave to brief the court. The motion is deemed WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 4/18/2022. (jrj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Strike #7 MOTION for Leave to File by Dennis Thompson. (kare) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WITHDRAWN-MOTION for Leave to Brief the Court by Dennis Thompson. (kare) Modified on 4/19/2022 (jlrr). (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 34625112051 (adh) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Filing Fee due on or before 4/11/2022 (kare) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ). A federal court may permit an indigent party to proceed without pre-payment of fees. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The Court is not satisfied from Thompsons affidavit that he is indigent. Plaintiff's trust fund account balance as of March 4, 2022 was $1,608.84 (Doc. #4 ). Accordingly, the Court DENIES the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ). Plaintiff shall pay the $402.00 filing fee no later than April 11, 2022. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 3/10/2022. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kare) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Thompson. (kare) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 03/04/2022. Consent due by 3/25/2022 (kare) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 22-436-SPM. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $402.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 3/4/2022. (kare) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Dennis Thompson.(kare) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant