This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2022 at 08:57:43 (UTC).

Thompson v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lance M Africk, Janis van Meerveld and Greg Gerard Guidry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01365

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judges

Lance M Africk

Greg Gerard Guidry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Velma Thompson

Velma Lee Thompson

Cross Claimants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Defendants

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Union Carbide Corporation

Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.

CBS Corporation

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

General Electric Company

International Paper Company

Hopeman Brothers Inc.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

ViacomCBS Inc

Northrup Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.

Northrup Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.

Avondale Industries, Inc.

Avondale Shipyards, Inc

Avondale Marine Ways, Inc.

Westinghouse Electric Corporation

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Union Carbide Corporation

Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.

CBS Corporation

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

General Electric Company

International Paper Company

Hopeman Brothers Inc.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust

Westinghouse Electric Corporation

3Rd Party Defendants and Cross Defendants

Uniroyal, Inc.

Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Ryan Cannella

Attorney at Baron & Budd

909 Poydras Street, Ste 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Benjamin David Rumph

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C. (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Christopher C. Colley

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C. (Baton Rouge)

2600 Citiplace Drive, Suite 400

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Kristopher Lynn Thompson

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C.

3102 Oak Lawn Ave, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

Cross Claimant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alexander R Saunders

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Connor Peth

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Daphne M. Lancaster

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Scott Minyard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

McGready Lewis Richeson

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Francis Xavier deBlanc, III

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Kathleen Jordan Brien

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford

1001 Mckinney St, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77002

Milele N. St. Julien

Attorney at Pugh Accardo Haas Radecker & Carey

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelly L. Long

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelly L. Long

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

21 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Paramount Global identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global. (Bowlin, Angela) Modified text on 7/11/2022 (mm). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#22

(#22) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler LLC (Bowlin, Angela) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#21

(#21) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Bowlin, Angela) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

20 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

20 #20

Main Document

19 #2

Proposed Order

19 #1

Proposed Pleading

19 #19

Main Document

16 #16

Main Document

6 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo recused. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 05/24/2022. (NEF to Case Manager)(am) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned United States District Judge recuses himself from further participation in this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to reallot the above captioned case to another section of court. All dates remain in effect unless modified by the judge to whom this case is transferred. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/23/22.(cg) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#3

(#3) DIRECTIVE BY THE CLERK Pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal.(lag) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Paramount Global identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global. (Bowlin, Angela) Modified text on 7/11/2022 (mm). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler LLC (Bowlin, Angela) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Bowlin, Angela) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 5/22/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 3/13/2023. Issued by Clerk for the Court. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(dp) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re: rec. doc. 12 by Velma Lee Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Cannella, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #16 MOTION for Joinder and to Adopt Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Opposition (R. Doc. 14) to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 12). **Document contains incorrect Section Letter. All future pleadings must reflect Section T Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.** (mm) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2022 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Joinder and to Adopt Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Opposition (R. Doc. 14) to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 12) by Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Semmes, Mathilde) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE A scheduling conference was set for today, Wednesday, June 29, 2022, beginning at 11:30 a.m. Timely calling into the conference was counsel for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., International Paper Company, Uniroyal Holding, Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. After approximately 10 minutes, the case manager concluded the call. The conference will be reset for another date and time so all parties can participate. Issued by Clerk for the Court. (dp) Modified on 7/7/2022 (dp). (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #12 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H - Part 1, #9 Exhibit H - Part 2, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2022 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 5/25/2022. (mm) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Edward W. Trapolin by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo recused. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 05/24/2022. (NEF to Case Manager)(am) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned United States District Judge recuses himself from further participation in this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to reallot the above captioned case to another section of court. All dates remain in effect unless modified by the judge to whom this case is transferred. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/23/22.(cg) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DIRECTIVE BY THE CLERK Pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal.(lag) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-7432 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9360184) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) Modified on 5/17/2022 (lag). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avondale Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc. is a litigant