This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2020 at 07:49:30 (UTC).

Thompson v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 Thompson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Harley-Davidson Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin C. Carlson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00050

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin C. Carlson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.

New Oxford, PA 17350

Defendants

Harley-Davidson Motor Company

International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas S. Markey

Attorney at McNees Wallace & Nurick LLC

100 Pine Street, Po Box 1166

Harrisburg, PA 17108

Anne E. Zerbe

Attorney at McNees Wallace & Nurick LLC

316 N. George St.

York, PA 17401

Lance M. Geren

Attorney at O'Donoghue & O'Donoghue, LLP

325 Chestnut Street, Suite 600

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

#16

15 #1

Appendix

#15

14 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#14

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

#12

#10

9 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Appendix

#4

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #13 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.(Thompson, Thomas) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Markey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Geren, Lance) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Geren, Lance) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Harley-Davidson Motor Company.(Markey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company.(Markey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.(Thompson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Geren, Lance) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Geren, Lance) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Harley-Davidson Motor Company, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Thomas W. Thompson, Jr YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 2/27/2020. (kjn) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/28/2020) (kjn). (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.(Thompson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.(Thompson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Markey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Geren, Lance) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss by Harley-Davidson Motor Company.(Markey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Carlson (jw) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harley-Davidson Motor Company from York County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-SU-001593. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4975105), filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mfa) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 9 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne E. Zerbe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Geren