This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 13:32:17 (UTC).

Thompson v. Durham School Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 Thompson filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Durham School Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly C Priest Johnson and Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00349

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kimberly C Priest Johnson

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gina Thompson

Defendants

Shawnta Lang

National Express, LLC

National Express, LLC doing business as Durham Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Edward Goodman, Jr

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore, PLLC - Dallas

3109 Carlisle, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75204

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina Thompson. National Express, LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Goodman, Robert) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina Thompson. Shawnta Lang served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Goodman, Robert) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gina Thompson.(Goodman, Robert) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to National Express, LLC.(General Manager, Dallas Charter 3017 - Shawnta Lang) (baf, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to National Express, LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Shawnta Lang. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against National Express, LLC dba Durham School Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7265180.), filed by Gina Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, Robert) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina Thompson. National Express, LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Goodman, Robert) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina Thompson. Shawnta Lang served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Goodman, Robert) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gina Thompson.(Goodman, Robert) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued as to National Express, LLC.(General Manager, Dallas Charter 3017 - Shawnta Lang) (baf, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to National Express, LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Shawnta Lang. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against National Express, LLC dba Durham School Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7265180.), filed by Gina Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, Robert) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less