This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/08/2020 at 16:13:04 (UTC).

Thompson v. City of Charlotte et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Thompson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Charlotte. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney, David S. Cayer and Max O. Cogburn, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00370

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

Presiding Judges

Frank D. Whitney

Max O. Cogburn, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Gail Thompson

Defendants

Brian E. Kurcsak

Joseph B. Wilson

City of Charlotte

Louis L. Venant

Johnny Jennings

Garry L. McFadden

John Doe

Laura House

Adelaide Kinstler

Wellpath, LLC

Joseph B. Breedlove

Samantha Elliott-McClaren

Ohio Casualty Insurance Company

Ebone Denise Roberts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karonnie R Truzy

Attorney at Crumley Roberts, LLP

2400 Freeman Mill Road, Suite 200

Greensboro, NC 27406

David Joseph Ventura

Attorney at Crumley Roberts, LLP

1051 East Morehead St., Suite 100

Charlotte, NC 28204

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Edward Peterson

Attorney at Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP

620 South Tryon Street, Suite 800

Charlotte, NC 28202

Clarence E. Matherson, Jr.

Attorney at Charlotte City Attorney's Office

600 East Fourth Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Sean F. Perrin

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

301 South College St., Suite 3500

Charlotte, NC 28202

Stephanie H. Webster

Attorney at Cranfill Sumner & Hartzog LLP

2907 Providence Road, Suite 200, Post Office Box 30787 (28230)

Charlotte, NC 28211

Jennifer Bryant Milak

Attorney at Teague, Campbell, Dennis & Gorham LLP

4700 Falls Of The Neuse Road, Suite 450

Raleigh, NC 27609

 

Court Documents

#21

20 #3

Summons

20 #2

Summons

20 #1

Summons

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

2 #12

Summons

2 #11

Summons

2 #10

Summons

2 #9

Summons

2 #8

Summons

2 #7

Summons

2 #1

Summons

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Wellpath, LLC.(Milak, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Summons Issued Electronically as to Joseph B. Breedlove, Samantha Elliot-McClaren, Laura House, Ebone Denise Roberts. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(mga) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. District Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Linda Gail Thompson.(Truzy, Karonnie) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Edward Peterson on behalf of Brian E. Kurcsak (Peterson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda Gail Thompson. Johnny Jennings waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Truzy, Karonnie) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda Gail Thompson. City of Charlotte waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Truzy, Karonnie) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda Gail Thompson. Brian E. Kurcsak waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Truzy, Karonnie) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Adelaide Kinstler. Adelaide Kinstler waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Webster, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie H. Webster on behalf of Adelaide Kinstler (Webster, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant Wellpath,LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wellpath, LLC.(Milak, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bryant Milak on behalf of Wellpath, LLC (Milak, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Garry L. McFadden. Garry L. McFadden waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Louis L. Venant. Louis L. Venant waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph B. Breedlove. Joseph B. Breedlove waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David Joseph Ventura on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ventura, David) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Joseph B. Breedlove, City of Charlotte, John Doe, Samantha Elliott, Laura House, Johnny Jennings, Adelaide Kinstler, Brian E. Kurcsak, Garry L. McFadden, Louis L. Venant, Wellpath, LLC, Joseph B. Wilson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(brj) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketClerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4569411), filed by Linda Gail Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Truzy, Karonnie) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wellpath LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Joseph Ventura

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karonnie R Truzy