This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 09:27:13 (UTC).

Thompson v. Carpenter et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Carpenter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are F. Keith Ball and Carlton W. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00601

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

Presiding Judge

Carlton W. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tarika Thompson

Defendants

Templet Transit LLC

John Does 1-5

Jill Templet

Michael C. Templet

Phillip H. Carpenter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aafram Y. Sellers

Attorney at SELLERS & ASSOCIATES, PLLC - Jackson

395 Edgewood Terrace Drive

Jackson, MS 39206

Defendant Attorneys

Arthur D. Spratlin, Jr.

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Caroline C. Loveless

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#7

(#7) AGREED ORDER of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL the claims against Defendants Michael C. Templet and Jill Templet in their individual capacity with prejudice. Jill Templet (Individually and as Owner, Operator and/ or Manager of Templet Transit LLC) and Michael C. Templet (Individually and as Owner, Operator and/or Manager of Templet Transit LLC) terminated. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/18/20 (TRS) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Templet Transit LLC (Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Templet Transit LLC (Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Phillip H. Carpenter (Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#3

(#3) State Court Record by Defendants Phillip H. Carpenter, Jill Templet, Michael C. Templet, Templet Transit LLC (Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline C. Loveless on behalf of Phillip H. Carpenter, Jill Templet, Michael C. Templet, Templet Transit LLC (Loveless, Caroline) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A Documents served on Defendants

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Phillip H. Carpenter, Jill Templet, Michael C. Templet, Templet Transit LLC from Madison County Circuit Court, MS, case number 45CO1:20-cv-347. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4370563) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Documents served on Defendants, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AGREED ORDER of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL the claims against Defendants Michael C. Templet and Jill Templet in their individual capacity with prejudice. Jill Templet (Individually and as Owner, Operator and/ or Manager of Templet Transit LLC) and Michael C. Templet (Individually and as Owner, Operator and/or Manager of Templet Transit LLC) terminated. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/18/20 (TRS) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Templet Transit LLC (Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Templet Transit LLC (Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Phillip H. Carpenter (Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) State Court Record by Defendants Phillip H. Carpenter, Jill Templet, Michael C. Templet, Templet Transit LLC (Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline C. Loveless on behalf of Phillip H. Carpenter, Jill Templet, Michael C. Templet, Templet Transit LLC (Loveless, Caroline) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Phillip H. Carpenter, Jill Templet, Michael C. Templet, Templet Transit LLC from Madison County Circuit Court, MS, case number 45CO1:20-cv-347. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4370563) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Documents served on Defendants, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less