Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2019 at 09:32:25 (UTC).

Thompson v. Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00319

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Thompson

Defendants

Balfour Beatty Construction, LLC

Safway Group Holdings, LLC

Balfour Beatty Equipment, LLC

Balfour Enterprises, Inc.

BrandSafway, LLC

Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc.

BrandSafway Solutions, LLC

BrandSafway Services, LLC

Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC

Safway, LLC

Safway Transfer and Storage, Inc.

BrandSafway Industries, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William H. Harkins, Jr.

Attorney at Brent Adams & Associates

Post Office Box 1389

Dunn, NC 28335

Brenton D. Adams

Attorney at Brent Adams & Associates

Post Office Box 1389

Dunn, NC 28335

Defendant Attorneys

Brian O. Beverly

Attorney at Young, Moore & Henderson, P.A.

P.O. Box 31627

Raleigh, NC 27622-1627

Amy E. Richardson

Attorney at Harris, Wiltshire, Grannis LLP

2009 Fairview Road, #6220

Raleigh, NC 27628

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) Notice of Appearance filed by Brenton D. Adams on behalf of Anthony Thompson. (Adams, Brenton) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#31

(#31) Certificate of Service filed by BrandSafway Industries, LLC, BrandSafway Services, LLC, BrandSafway Solutions, LLC, BrandSafway, LLC, Safway Group Holdings, LLC, Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC regarding #15 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) served on Contaminant Control, Inc. containing defense of employer negligence. (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#30

(#30) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Anthony Thompson as to Balfour Enterprises, Inc.. (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#29

(#29) Financial Disclosure Statement by Anthony Thompson (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#28

(#28) Notice of Appearance filed by William H. Harkins, Jr on behalf of Anthony Thompson. (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#27

(#27) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Anthony Thompson as to Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc.. (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#26

(#26) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Anthony Thompson as to Balfour Beatty Equipment, LLC. (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#25

(#25) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Anthony Thompson as to Balfour Beatty Construction, LLC. (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#15

(#31) Certificate of Service filed by BrandSafway Industries, LLC, BrandSafway Services, LLC, BrandSafway Solutions, LLC, BrandSafway, LLC, Safway Group Holdings, LLC, Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC regarding #15 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) served on Contaminant Control, Inc. containing defense of employer negligence. (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#6

(#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by Safway, LLC (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#5

(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by BrandSafway, LLC (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#4

(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#3

(#3) Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet - 5 pages by BrandSafway Industries, LLC, BrandSafway Services, LLC, BrandSafway Solutions, LLC, BrandSafway, LLC, Safway Group Holdings, LLC, Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC (Beverly, Brian) Modified on 7/31/2019 to clarify docket text. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Brian O. Beverly on behalf of BrandSafway Industries, LLC, BrandSafway Services, LLC, BrandSafway Solutions, LLC, BrandSafway, LLC, Safway Group Holdings, LLC, Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC. (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit state court amended complaint

1 #2

Exhibit state court summons for amended complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BrandSafway Services, LLC, Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC, Safway Group Holdings, LLC, BrandSafway Industries, LLC, BrandSafway, LLC, BrandSafway Solutions, LLC from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number 19 CVS 3742. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5036779), filed by BrandSafway Services, LLC, Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC, Safway Group Holdings, LLC, BrandSafway Industries, LLC, BrandSafway, LLC, BrandSafway Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Exhibit state court summons for amended complaint, #3 Exhibit state court amended complaint) (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Notice of Appearance filed by Brenton D. Adams on behalf of Anthony Thompson. (Adams, Brenton) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Certificate of Service filed by BrandSafway Industries, LLC, BrandSafway Services, LLC, BrandSafway Solutions, LLC, BrandSafway, LLC, Safway Group Holdings, LLC, Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC regarding #15 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) served on Contaminant Control, Inc. containing defense of employer negligence. (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Anthony Thompson as to Balfour Enterprises, Inc.. (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Financial Disclosure Statement by Anthony Thompson (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Notice of Appearance filed by William H. Harkins, Jr on behalf of Anthony Thompson. (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Anthony Thompson as to Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc.. (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Anthony Thompson as to Balfour Beatty Equipment, LLC. (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Anthony Thompson as to Balfour Beatty Construction, LLC. (Harkins, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Anthony Thompson. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. Further, pursuant to Local Rule 5.2, all counsel must file a notice of appearance. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by BrandSafway Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SafeSource, LLC, Corporate Parent Safway Group Holding, LLC for BrandSafway Services, LLC. (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Financial Disclosure Statement by BrandSafway Industries, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Brand Industrial Projects, LLC, Corporate Parent Brand Shared Services, LLC for BrandSafway Industries, LLC. (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by BrandSafway Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MobleySafway Solutions Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent SafeSource, LLC, Corporate Parent Safway Group Holding, LLC for BrandSafway Solutions, LLC. (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by Safway Group Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Badger Intermediate Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Badger Holding, LLC for Safway Group Holdings, LLC. (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by Safway, LLC (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by BrandSafway, LLC (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet - 5 pages by BrandSafway Industries, LLC, BrandSafway Services, LLC, BrandSafway Solutions, LLC, BrandSafway, LLC, Safway Group Holdings, LLC, Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC (Beverly, Brian) Modified on 7/31/2019 to clarify docket text. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Brian O. Beverly on behalf of BrandSafway Industries, LLC, BrandSafway Services, LLC, BrandSafway Solutions, LLC, BrandSafway, LLC, Safway Group Holdings, LLC, Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC. (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BrandSafway Services, LLC, Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC, Safway Group Holdings, LLC, BrandSafway Industries, LLC, BrandSafway, LLC, BrandSafway Solutions, LLC from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number 19 CVS 3742. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5036779), filed by BrandSafway Services, LLC, Thyssenkrupp Safway, LLC, Safway Group Holdings, LLC, BrandSafway Industries, LLC, BrandSafway, LLC, BrandSafway Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Exhibit state court summons for amended complaint, #3 Exhibit state court amended complaint) (Beverly, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brandsafway Industries LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFWAY GROUP HOLDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Brandsafway Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFWAY SERVICES L.P. is a litigant