This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2023 at 08:22:46 (UTC).

Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc. v. American Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against American Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-05020

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.

Defendants

HDI Global Specialty SE

American Casualty Company

National American Insurance Company

Commerce & Industry Insurance Company

Colony Insurance Company

Evanston Insurance Company

Western World Insurance Company

Scottsdale Insurance Company

International Insurance Company of Hannover Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lauren O. Baber

Defendant Attorneys

Pamela Dunlop Gates

Jason T. Browning

Steven K Metcalf

Richard Shane Strabala

David M. Donovan

Taylor Williams

William A. Waddell, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven K Metcalf on behalf of National American Insurance Company. (Metcalf, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#21

(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Casualty Company. (Dunlop Gates, Pamela) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, incorrectly sued as American Casualty Company by American Casualty Company.(Dunlop Gates, Pamela) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. Commerce & Industry Insurance Company served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. Western World Insurance Company served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. Scottsdale Insurance Company served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. National American Insurance Company served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. American Casualty Company served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

2 #6

Exhibit F - US Framing's Subcontract Agreement

2 #5

Exhibit E - Prestige Contractor's Subcontract Agreement

2 #3

Exhibit C - Amended Complaint filed in TTC v. subcontractors

2 #2

Exhibit B - WCP Detailed Stmt of Claims_Arb

2 #1

Exhibit A - WCP Complaint

2 #2

Main Document

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (lgd) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven K Metcalf on behalf of National American Insurance Company. (Metcalf, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Casualty Company. (Dunlop Gates, Pamela) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, incorrectly sued as American Casualty Company by American Casualty Company.(Dunlop Gates, Pamela) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Williams on behalf of Colony Insurance Company. (Williams, Taylor) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, by Colony Insurance Company.(Donovan, David) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading by Commerce & Industry Insurance Company AND Western World Insurance Company. Separate Defendants' responsive pleading must be filed on or before MARCH 31, 2023. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 15, 2023. (slc) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading by Commerce & Industry Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company. (Strabala, Richard) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Separate Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company's answer or other responsive pleading is now due by 3/31/2023. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 14, 2023. (ee) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,, by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Waddell, William) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, by National American Insurance Company.(Browning, Jason) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. Commerce & Industry Insurance Company served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. Western World Insurance Company served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. Scottsdale Insurance Company served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. National American Insurance Company served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. American Casualty Company served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to American Casualty Company, Colony Insurance Company, Commerce & Industry Insurance Company, Evanston Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, National American Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to American Casualty Company, Colony Insurance Company, Commerce & Industry Insurance Company, Evanston Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE f/k/a International Insurance Company of Hannover Ltd., National American Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,,. (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2720899), filed by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WCP Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - WCP Detailed Stmt of Claims_Arb, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint filed in TTC v. subcontractors, #4 Exhibit D - Roofing Systems Inc's Subcontract Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Prestige Contractor's Subcontract Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - US Framing's Subcontract Agreement)(Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (lgd) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less