This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2020 at 12:57:04 (UTC).

Thompson Read v. Saharah, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Thompson Read filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Saharah, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa L Springmann and Joshua P Kolar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00233

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Springmann

Referral Judge

Joshua P Kolar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A. Dominique Thompson Read

Valparaiso, IN 46385

Naomi

Defendants

Saharah, Inc.

601 Killarney Drive

Dyer, IN 46311

Seif El Sharif

Dyer, IN 46311

Saharah, Inc. doing business as Fantasy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian N Custy

Attorney at Custy Law Firm LLC - Val/IN

4004 Campbell St Ste 4

Valparaiso, IN 46385

Jarrett L Ellzey PHV, Jr

Attorney at Hughes Ellzey LLP

1105 Milford St

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

David A Buls

Attorney at Krieg DeVault LLP - Mer/IN

8001 Broadway Ste 400

Merrillville, IN 46410

James E Daugherty

Attorney at Law Offices of James E Daugherty

8029 Cleveland Pl

Merrillville, IN 46410

 

Court Documents

#18

17 #1

Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 12

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#5

#4

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Proposed Summons El Sarif Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons Saharah, Inc. Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Stay DISCOVERY PENDING THE COURTS RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Seif El Sharif, Saharah, Inc.. (Daugherty, James) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPENDIX to #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 56 AND MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b) APPENDIX OF DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/MOTION TO DISMISS by Seif El Sharif, Saharah, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 12)(Daugherty, James) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 56 AND MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b) filed by Seif El Sharif, Saharah, Inc.. (Daugherty, James) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2020 10:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/10/2020. (tc) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 56 AND MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b) by Defendants Seif El Sharif, Saharah, Inc.. (Daugherty, James) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by James E Daugherty on behalf of Seif El Sharif (Daugherty, James) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Saharah, Inc.. (Daugherty, James) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James E Daugherty on behalf of Saharah, Inc. (Daugherty, James) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James E Daugherty on behalf of Seif El Sharif (Daugherty, James) ***FILING ERROR; ATTORNEY REFILED AT #12 *** Modified on 8/7/2020 (ace). (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jarrett L Ellzey PHV, Jr for A. Dominique Thompson Read. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/22/2020. (ace) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Attorney Jarrett L. Ellzey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff A. Dominique Thompson Read. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4288409 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/16/2020. (tc) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Answer due 8/11/2020. (shk) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Seif El Sharif, Saharah, Inc.. (Buls, David) Modified on 7/15/2020 (shk). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David A Buls on behalf of Seif El Sharif, Saharah, Inc. (Buls, David) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Seif El Sharif. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Saharah, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docket**NEW CASE** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (shk) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4256276.), filed by A. Dominique Thompson Read. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Saharah, Inc. Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons El Sarif Proposed Summons)(Custy, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NAOMI A TAYLOR TRUSTEE UNDER THE NAOMI TAYLOR LIVING TRUST DATED MAY 2 2012 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A Buls