This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2020 at 07:06:36 (UTC).

Thompson, Jr. v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Thompson, Jr filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian K. Epps and R. Stan Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00091

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

Presiding Judge

R. Stan Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clinton T. Thompson, Jr.

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Not Classified By Court

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kipler Scott Lamar

Attorney at Harrison & Lamar

P.O. Box 1456

Augusta, GA 30903

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Statement

#3

(#3) ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to Andrew M. Saul. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 10/12/2020. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Statement) (loh) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to Andrew M. Saul. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 10/12/2020. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Statement) (loh) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, Attorney General of The United States, United States Attorney, and the Office of General Counsel. (Attachments: Summons, Summons, Summons)(loh) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2932820. (loh) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Clinton T. Thompson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less