Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2019 at 07:07:44 (UTC).

Thomason v. Taylor et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 Thomason filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Taylor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzanne Mitchell and David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00935

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Suzanne Mitchell

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeremy J Thomason

Cushing, OK 74023-5337

Defendants

FNU Taylor

Demaris Guerra

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeremy J Thomason (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 2 SUMMONS(ES) by Jeremy J Thomason. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

6 #4

Envelope

6 #3

Attachment 3 - Request to Staff

6 #1

Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy J Thomason. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment 2 - Cover Letter, #3 Attachment 3 - Request to Staff, #4 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER to Cure Deficiencies re #1 Complaint filed by Jeremy J Thomason, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeremy J Thomason. The court orders Plaintiff to file the required forms and documentation on or before Wednesday, November 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/16/19. (lb) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Entered at the direction of the Honorable David L. Russell on 10/10/19. (nv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#3

(#3) NO PREVIOUS Cases (nv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy J Thomason. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Demaris Guerra, FNU Taylor filed by Jeremy J Thomason. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeremy J Thomason (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER On or before December 2, 2019, Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $7.11 which, based upon his submissions, represents 20 percent of "the average monthly deposits to [his] accounts for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action...." Id. The undersigned specifically cautions Plaintiff that unless by December 2, 2019, he has either (1) paid the $7.11 initial partial filing fee in full or (2) shown cause in writing for his failure to pay, the undersigned will, without further warning, recommend the dismissal without prejudice of this action for Plaintiffs failure to comply with an order of this Court. Then, after payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to his institutional accounts until the total filing fee of $350 has been paid. granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 11/7/2019. (sr) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 2 SUMMONS(ES) by Jeremy J Thomason. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy J Thomason. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment 2 - Cover Letter, #3 Attachment 3 - Request to Staff, #4 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER to Cure Deficiencies re #1 Complaint filed by Jeremy J Thomason, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeremy J Thomason. The court orders Plaintiff to file the required forms and documentation on or before Wednesday, November 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/16/19. (lb) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Entered at the direction of the Honorable David L. Russell on 10/10/19. (nv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NO PREVIOUS Cases (nv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy J Thomason. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Demaris Guerra, FNU Taylor filed by Jeremy J Thomason. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less