This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2021 at 11:17:44 (UTC).

Thomas v. Wal-Mart Associates Inc

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Thomas filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Associates Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Goodwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00094

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Goodwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Celia Thomas

Defendant

Wal-Mart Associates Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amber L Hurst

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Mark E Hammons

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Paula M Williams

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 15Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Amy M Stipe

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 15Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Brennan T Barger

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 15Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Hammons EOA

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Roberts EOA

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Hurst EOA

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Petition

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Wal-Mart Associates Inc. (Stipe, Amy) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Wal-Mart Associates Inc filed by All Plaintiffs.(Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Wal-Mart Associates Inc. (Williams, Paula) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Brennan T Barger on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates Inc (Barger, Brennan) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Amy M Stipe on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates Inc (Stipe, Amy) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Associates Inc . (Williams, Paula) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Paula M Williams on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates Inc (Williams, Paula) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3586534. (Williams, Paula) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-200 filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hammons EOA, #3 Exhibit 3 - Roberts EOA, #4 Exhibit 4 - Hurst EOA, #5 Exhibit 5 - Petition, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark E Hammons

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber L Hurst