This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2021 at 09:14:29 (UTC).

Thomas v. Texas Department of Family and Protective Services

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Thomas filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Texas Department of Family and Protective Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00437

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charmion Thomas

Defendants

Texas Department of Family and Protective Services (CPS)

Texas Department of Family and Protective Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W D Masterson, III

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC

3109 Carlisle, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Laurence Abrahamson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station Mc:019

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) REPLY filed by Texas Department of Family and Protective Services re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Abrahamson, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE filed by Charmion Thomas re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Masterson, W) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#7

(#7) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Texas Department of Family and Protective Services re #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Abrahamson, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Texas Department of Family and Protective Services Attorney Daniel Laurence Abrahamson added to party Texas Department of Family and Protective Services(pty:dft) (Abrahamson, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Texas Department of Family and Protective Services ; served on 3/22/2021. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Texas Department of Family and Protective Services (CPS). (wxc) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charmion Thomas. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Texas Department of Family and Protective Services (CPS) filed by Charmion Thomas. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11706449) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Masterson, W) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY filed by Texas Department of Family and Protective Services re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Abrahamson, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE filed by Charmion Thomas re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Masterson, W) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Texas Department of Family and Protective Services re #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Abrahamson, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Texas Department of Family and Protective Services Attorney Daniel Laurence Abrahamson added to party Texas Department of Family and Protective Services(pty:dft) (Abrahamson, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Texas Department of Family and Protective Services ; served on 3/22/2021. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Texas Department of Family and Protective Services (CPS). (wxc) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charmion Thomas. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Texas Department of Family and Protective Services (CPS) filed by Charmion Thomas. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11706449) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Masterson, W) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES is a litigant