This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2022 at 07:46:53 (UTC).

Thomas v. Switzer et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 Thomas filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Switzer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William E. Smith and Lincoln D. Almond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00488

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Thomas

Defendants

Justin Switzer

Ian Bissonette

Jason Berthelette

John 1-5 Doe

North Smithfield

City of Woonsocket

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shannah M. Kurland

149 Lenox Avenue

Providence, RI 02907

Defendant Attorney

Marc DeSisto

Attorney at DeSisto Law LLC

60 Ship Street

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Appendix Waiver of service request

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by North Smithfield, Ian Bissonette, Justin Switzer. North Smithfield waiver sent on 12/15/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by North Smithfield, Ian Bissonette, Justin Switzer. Justin Switzer waiver sent on 12/15/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by North Smithfield, Ian Bissonette, Justin Switzer. Ian Bissonette waiver sent on 12/15/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of Ian Bissonette, North Smithfield, Justin Switzer (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Ian Bissonette, North Smithfield, Justin Switzer.(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 2:00 PM by Zoom before District Judge William E. Smith. Zoom access information will be sent to counsel by email. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 2:00 PM by Zoom before District Judge William E. Smith. Zoom access information will be sent to counsel by email. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Ian Bissonette, North Smithfield, Justin Switzer.(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of Ian Bissonette, North Smithfield, Justin Switzer (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by North Smithfield, Ian Bissonette, Justin Switzer. Ian Bissonette waiver sent on 12/15/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by North Smithfield, Ian Bissonette, Justin Switzer. Justin Switzer waiver sent on 12/15/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by North Smithfield, Ian Bissonette, Justin Switzer. North Smithfield waiver sent on 12/15/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1695879 ), filed by Bryan Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Waiver of service request)(Kurland, Shannah) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1695879 ), filed by Bryan Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Waiver of service request)(Kurland, Shannah) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc DeSisto