This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2021 at 09:17:18 (UTC).

Thomas v. Smith et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Thomas filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darin Ace Thomas

Defendants

Shaun Smith

Duchesne County Clerk

Grant Charles

Vernal Police Department

Duchesne County Attorney

Vernal City

Duchesne County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Randall W Richards

Attorney at RICHARDS & BROWN PC

938 University Park Blvd Ste 140

Clearfield, UT 84015

Defendant Attorneys

Heather S. White

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Danica N. Cepernich

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Jesse C Trentadue

Attorney at SUITTER AXLAND

8 E Broadway Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Sarah E. Jenkins

Attorney at SUITTER AXLAND

8 E Broadway Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Noah M. Hoagland

Attorney at SUITTER AXLAND

8 E Broadway Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Michael W. Homer

Attorney at SUITTER AXLAND

8 E Broadway Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#22

#20

#19

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

#15

#14

#13

#10

#9

#8

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendants Grant Charles, Duchesne County, Duchesne County Attorney, Shaun Smith, Vernal City, Plaintiff Darin Ace Thomas. (alf) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#21) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Shaun Smith. (alf) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #15 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/28/2022. Motions due by 8/29/2022. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/14/21. (alf) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Heather) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket(#17) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Grant Charles, Duchesne County, Duchesne County Attorney. (alf) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket(#16) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Shaun Smith, Vernal City. (alf) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Grant Charles, Duchesne County, Duchesne County Attorney, Shaun Smith, Vernal City, Plaintiff Darin Ace Thomas. Form due by 5/26/2021. (alf) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint filed by Grant Charles, Duchesne County, Duchesne County Attorney. Attorney Jesse C Trentadue added to party Grant Charles(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse C Trentadue added to party Duchesne County(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse C Trentadue added to party Duchesne County Attorney (pty:dft)(Trentadue, Jesse) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Shaun Smith, Vernal City.(White, Heather) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather S. White on behalf of Shaun Smith, Vernal City (White, Heather) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #8 Amended Complaint Acknowledgment filed by Vernal City, Shaun Smith.Vernal City served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021; Shaun Smith served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (White, Heather) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Vernal City, Duchesne County. Removed Defendants: Vernal Police Department, Duchesne County Clerk. filed by Darin Ace Thomas. (Richards, Randall) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Shaun Smith. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Vernal Police Department. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Duchesne County Attorney. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Grant Charles. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Duchesne County Clerk. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3971490) filed by Darin Ace Thomas. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Richards, Randall) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Darin Ace Thomas is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DUCHESNE COUNTY, a Utah governmental entity is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall W Richards