This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2022 at 07:37:44 (UTC).

THOMAS v. SMITH

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 THOMAS filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00437

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHELTON R THOMAS

Oglethorpe, GA 31068

Respondent

Warden Tamarshae Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Clint Christopher Malcolm

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334

Paula K. Smith

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Grounds

1 #2

Envelope

#2

(#6) ORDER - Because Petitioner has sufficient funds to pay the $5.00 filing fee, his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, [Doc. #2 ], is DENIED. Petitioner is ORDERED to pay the $5.00 filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is entered. The Clerk is DIRECTED to RESUBMIT this action to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon Petitioner's payment of the $5.00 filing fee or the expiration of the thirty-day time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/9/2022. (tcc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 2/2/2020. (chc) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 02/02/2022)

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#6

Submission of #6 Order ruling on IFP, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (tcc) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER directing Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to State Attorney General. Respondent is directed to show cause within 60 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 3/11/2022. (jra) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for an Order that instruct the Respondent to withdraw the filing fee from Petitioner's Inmate account by SHELTON R THOMAS. (vs) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Christopher Malcolm on behalf of Tamarshae Smith (Malcolm, Clint) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Tamarshae Smith (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER - Petitioner's "motion to order Respondent to withdraw filing fee from Petitioner's inmate account," [Doc. #8 ], is DENIED AS MOOT. Petitioner is REMINDED that he must keep this Court advised of his current address and telephone number at all times while his lawsuit is pending, and failure to do so shall result in the dismissal of this action pursuant to Local Rule 41.2(B), N.D. Ga. Petitioner's failure to comply with any Orders of this Court shall result in the dismissal of this action pursuant to Local Rule 41.3, N.D. Ga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 3/21/2022. (tcc) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to SHELTON R THOMAS re #11 Order. (tcc) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER - Petitioner's "motion to order Respondent to withdraw filing fee from Petitioner's inmate account," [Doc. #8 ], is DENIED AS MOOT. Petitioner is REMINDED that he must keep this Court advised of his current address and telephone number at all times while his lawsuit is pending, and failure to do so shall result in the dismissal of this action pursuant to Local Rule 41.2(B), N.D. Ga. Petitioner's failure to comply with any Orders of this Court shall result in the dismissal of this action pursuant to Local Rule 41.3, N.D. Ga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 3/21/2022. (tcc) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Tamarshae Smith (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Christopher Malcolm on behalf of Tamarshae Smith (Malcolm, Clint) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of (Certified) Mailing Attorney General Chris Carr (re: 91 7199 9991 7032 5717 8859) re #7 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition and #1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. (jra) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of (Certified) Mailing as to Tamarshae Smith (re: 91 7199 9991 7032 5717 8842) re #7 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition & #1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (jra) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to SHELTON R THOMAS re #7 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition. (jra) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for an Order that instruct the Respondent to withdraw the filing fee from Petitioner's Inmate account by SHELTON R THOMAS. (vs) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER directing Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to State Attorney General. Respondent is directed to show cause within 60 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 3/11/2022. (jra) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #6 Order ruling on IFP, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (tcc) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid: $ 5.00, receipt number 136594. (tcc) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to SHELTON R THOMAS re #6 Order ruling on IFP. (tcc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - Because Petitioner has sufficient funds to pay the $5.00 filing fee, his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, [Doc. #2 ], is DENIED. Petitioner is ORDERED to pay the $5.00 filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is entered. The Clerk is DIRECTED to RESUBMIT this action to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon Petitioner's payment of the $5.00 filing fee or the expiration of the thirty-day time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/9/2022. (tcc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (aar) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:22-cv-00052. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCase Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 2/17/2022.) (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 2/2/2020. (chc) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by SHELTON R THOMAS. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS,filed by SHELTON R THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Grounds, #2 Envelope)(vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/3/2022.] (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINT C MALCOLM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith