This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 07:15:56 (UTC).

Thomas v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Thomas filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrea R. Wood and M. David Weisman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06358

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Andrea R. Wood

M. David Weisman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andre R. Thomas

Defendant

Andrew Marshall Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Alan Schultz

Attorney at Law Offices of Barry A. Schultz

1601 Sherman Avenue, Suite 500

Evanston, IL 60201

Defendant Attorneys

AUSA-SSA

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Megan Elizabeth Donohue

Attorney at Assistant United States Attorney

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file the electronic certified administrative record #8 is granted up to and including 2/26/2021. Mailed notice (ao,) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file the electronic certified administrative record #8 is granted up to and including 2/26/2021. Mailed notice (ao,) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Donohue, Megan) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING : Case reassigned to the Honorable M. David Weisman, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1 (C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Andrea R. Wood no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/3/2020. (ec, ) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Schultz, Barry) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DESIGNATION of Megan Elizabeth Donohue as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Donohue, Megan) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: This matter is before the Court for review of a final decision by the Commissioner of Social Security. The parties should promptly consult with each other to determine whether they will consent to the reassignment of this case to the magistrate judge for all further proceedings. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, they should file a joint statement of consent pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(a). Otherwise, pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review within 60 days after the filing of the answer to the complaint or the administrative record. Within 45 days thereafter, the Commissioner shall file its motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days thereafter. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andre R. Thomas by Barry Alan Schultz (Schultz, Barry) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schultz, Barry) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Andre R. Thomas; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17583282. (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Schultz, Barry) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less