This case was last updated from PACER on 02/07/2020 at 07:31:45 (UTC).

Thomas v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 Thomas filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofi US Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14290

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trudie Thomas

Defendants

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Sun Pharma Global FZE

Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Hospira, Inc.

Pfizer Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Accord Healthcare, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Hospira Worldwide, LLC

Sandoz Inc.

Sandoz, Inc.

Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Christopher Elliott

Attorney at Bachus & Schanker, LLC (Denver)

1899 Wynkoop Street, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80202

Darin Lee Schanker

Attorney at Bachus & Schanker, LLC (Denver)

1899 Wynkoop Street, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80202

Jere Kyle Bachus

Attorney at Bachus & Schanker, LLC (Denver)

1899 Wynkoop Street, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

1 #13

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #14

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (dw) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #4

Summons

1 #9

Summons

#4

(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

1 #6

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8014498) filed by Trudie Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)Attorney John Christopher Elliott added to party Trudie Thomas(pty:pla).(Elliott, John) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Summons

1 #12

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #2

Summons

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (dw) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8014498) filed by Trudie Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)Attorney John Christopher Elliott added to party Trudie Thomas(pty:pla).(Elliott, John) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.