This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 07:59:06 (UTC).

THOMAS v. SANDERSON et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 THOMAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SANDERSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and James Patrick Hanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02648

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LENDON THOMAS

Defendants

WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.

MARY L. SANDERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A. Weathers

Attorney at ISAACS & ISAACS PSC

1601 Business Center Court

Louisville, KY 40299

Caroline Bonnie Clay

Attorney at ISAACS & ISAACS, P.S.C.

1601 Business Center Court

Louisville, KY 40299

Defendant Attorney

Robert R. Foos

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER, LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202-6150

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to Notice of Removal, re #1 Notice of Removal, #9 Order, filed by Plaintiff LENDON THOMAS. (Clay, Caroline) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER - More than 30 days have passed since the filing of the notice of removal, yet Plaintiff has not moved to remand or filed a response. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by August 23, 2019 (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/9/2019.(DWH) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#8

(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Foos on behalf of Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

3 #1

State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance, Subpoena/Summons, Appearance, Motion

#3

(#3) Submission of Exhibit A: Complaint and State Court Record, filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance, Subpoena/Summons, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Jury Demand, Order on MET and Amended Appearances (2)))(Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bartholomew County Circuit Court, case number 03C01-1904-CT-002268, filed by WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5503403) (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE to Notice of Removal, re #1 Notice of Removal, #9 Order, filed by Plaintiff LENDON THOMAS. (Clay, Caroline) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER - More than 30 days have passed since the filing of the notice of removal, yet Plaintiff has not moved to remand or filed a response. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by August 23, 2019 (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/9/2019.(DWH) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Foos on behalf of Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Submission of Exhibit A: Complaint and State Court Record, filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance, Subpoena/Summons, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Jury Demand, Order on MET and Amended Appearances (2)))(Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendant WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bartholomew County Circuit Court, case number 03C01-1904-CT-002268, filed by WILEY SANDERS TRUCK LINES, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5503403) (Foos, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.