Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2021 at 07:43:45 (UTC).

Thomas v. Randstad

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 Thomas filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Randstad. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paige J Gossett and J Michelle Childs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-03883

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paige J Gossett

Presiding Judge

J Michelle Childs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Traci Abraham Thomas

Orangeburg, SC 29118

Defendant

Randstad

 

Court Documents

8 #2

Envelope

8 #1

Supporting Documents

#8

(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Traci Abraham Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (mmcd) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#6

(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/30/2020. (mmcd) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time by Traci Abraham Thomas. Response to Motion due by 11/20/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (mmcd) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Notice of Right to Sue

1 #1

Cover letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 497.00 receipt number SCX300090513.), filed by Traci Abraham Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Envelope) (mmcd) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Traci Abraham Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (mmcd) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, blank summons form, and a blank Local Civil Rule 26.01 (D.S.C.) Interrogatories placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Traci Abraham Thomas 3575 Tamara Lane Orangeburg, SC 29118. (mmcd) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/30/2020. (mmcd) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time by Traci Abraham Thomas. Response to Motion due by 11/20/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (mmcd) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 497.00 receipt number SCX300090513.), filed by Traci Abraham Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Envelope) (mmcd) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RANDSTAD CORPORATION is a litigant