This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2020 at 07:57:05 (UTC).

Thomas v. Northwest Immigration Detention Center et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Thomas filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Northwest Immigration Detention Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Bryan and J Richard Creatura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05039

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Bryan

Referral Judge

J Richard Creatura

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashton Wallace Rodger Thomas

Tacoma, WA 98421-1615

Defendants

Neil Clark

GEO

Northwest Immigration Detention Center

Kevin Wilks

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Neil Clark, GEO, Northwest Immigration Detention Center, Kevin Wilks, filed by Ashton Wallace Rodger Thomas.(IFP Granted) (ERA) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (ERA - cc: plaintiff) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#2

(#2) LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 2/18/2020 to correct. (ERA - cc: plaintiff with forms) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

1 #1

Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint

#1

(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Ashton W Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint) (ERA) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Neil Clark, GEO, Northwest Immigration Detention Center, Kevin Wilks, filed by Ashton Wallace Rodger Thomas.(IFP Granted) (ERA) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (ERA - cc: plaintiff) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 2/18/2020 to correct. (ERA - cc: plaintiff with forms) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Ashton W Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint) (ERA) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less