This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 16:32:49 (UTC).

Thomas v. Hospital Service Associates, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 Thomas filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Hospital Service Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey J. Helmick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01742

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey J. Helmick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mary Thomas

Mary M. Thomas

Defendants

Hospital Service Associates, Inc.

Hospital Service Associates, Inc. doing business as APS Medical Billing and Professional Consultants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel I. Bryant

Attorney at Bryant Legal, LLC

1550 Old Henderson Road

Columbus, OH 43220

Matthew B. Bryant

Attorney at Ste. 370

3450 West Central Avenue

Toledo, OH 43606

Defendant Attorney

Lynn Vuketich Luther

Attorney at Eastman & Smith - Toledo

24Th Floor, P.O. Box 10032, One Seagate

Toledo, OH 43699-0032

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Hospital Service Associates, Inc.. (Luther, Lynn) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#4

(#4) Attorney Appearance by Lynn Vuketich Luther filed by on behalf of Hospital Service Associates, Inc.. (Luther, Lynn) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mary M. Thomas. Hospital Service Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 filed on behalf of Mary M. Thomas (Bryant, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Hospital Service Associates, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9447073.. Filed by Mary Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bryant, Daniel) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Hospital Service Associates, Inc.. (Luther, Lynn) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Attorney Appearance by Lynn Vuketich Luther filed by on behalf of Hospital Service Associates, Inc.. (Luther, Lynn) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mary M. Thomas. Hospital Service Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 filed on behalf of Mary M. Thomas (Bryant, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against Hospital Service Associates, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9447073.. Filed by Mary Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bryant, Daniel) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hospital Service District No 3 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynn Vuketich Luther