This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2021 at 08:58:37 (UTC).

Thomas v. Five Prime Therapeutics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Thomas filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Five Prime Therapeutics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02477

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Satheesh Thomas

Defendants

Peder K. Jensen

Thomas Civik

Carol Schafer

Five Prime Therapeutics, Inc.

Garry Nicholson

William R. Ringo

Kapil Dhingra

Lori Lyons-Williams

Franklin M. Berger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel E. Elkins

Attorney at WeissLaw LLP

9100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 725 E.

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Satheesh Thomas (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 4/23/2021) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/7/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Franklin M. Berger, Thomas Civik, Kapil Dhingra, Five Prime Therapeutics, Inc., Peder K. Jensen, Lori Lyons-Williams, Garry Nicholson, William R. Ringo, Carol Schafer. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Satheesh Thomas (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Franklin M. Berger, Thomas Civik, Kapil Dhingra, Five Prime Therapeutics, Inc., Peder K. Jensen, Lori Lyons-Williams, Garry Nicholson, William R. Ringo, Carol Schafer (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0971-15803357). Filed bySatheesh Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 4/6/2021) Modified on 4/7/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Five Prime Therapeutics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel E. Elkins