This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2020 at 09:30:54 (UTC).

Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Thomas filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney and Leonard T Strand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-02088

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Leonard T Strand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricky Thomas, Jr

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Corbett Allen Luedeman

Attorney at RSH Legal

425 Second Street Se, Suite 1140

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

Wes Kappelman

Attorney at Kappelman Law Firm

Po Box 1792

Ames, IA 50010

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/26/2020. (des) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Social Security new case packet) (des) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Ricky Thomas, Jr. Dismissal Deadline 2/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (des) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/26/2020. (des) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. #1 Motion referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. (mmc) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ricky Thomas, Jr (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kappelman, Wes) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less