This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2020 at 09:47:55 (UTC).

Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Thomas filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald E. Bush and David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00388

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ronald E. Bush

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Charles E. Thomas

Respondent

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mark B Jones

Attorney at Mark B. Jones, Attorney at Law, Chartered

Po Box 2011

Sandpoint, ID 83864

Respondent Attorney

Joanne P Rodriguez

Attorney at United States Attorney's office

1290 West Myrtle Street, Suite 500

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER. All Matters in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER. All Matters in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rodriguez, Joanne)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:20-cv-388-DCN (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketThe 21 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Charles E. Thomas re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/28/2020. (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Social Security Number by Charles E. Thomas This is a sealed document.. (Jones, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REVIEW - Complaint (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2085630.), filed by Charles E. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Jones, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less