This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 08:25:21 (UTC).

Thomas v. Brooks

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Thomas filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Brooks. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leigh Martin May and Justin S. Anand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05228

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Julius Thomas

Defendant and Respondent

Nathan Brooks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

August F. Siemon

Attorney at Office of August F. Siemon

P.O. Box 599

Atlanta, GA 30301-0599

Respondent Attorneys

Matthew Blackwell Crowder

Attorney at Georgia Department of Law

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

Paula K. Smith

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

7 #20

Exhibit Exhibit 9 a copy of the Brief of Appellant from Petitioners direct appe

7 #19

Exhibit Exhibit 8 a copy of the transcript of the hearing on Petitioners motion

7 #18

Exhibit Exhibit 7 a copy of the Clerks record from Petitioners criminal case.

7 #17

Exhibit Exhibit 6(i) a copy of part 9 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners

7 #15

Exhibit Exhibit 6(g) a copy of part 7 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners

7 #14

Exhibit Exhibit 6(g) a copy of part 7 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners

7 #13

Exhibit Exhibit 6(g) a copy of part 7 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners

7 #12

Exhibit Exhibit 6(g) a copy of part 7 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners

7 #11

Exhibit Exhibit 6(f) a copy of part 6 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners

7 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 6(e) a copy of part 5 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners

7 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 6(d) a copy of part 4 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners

7 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 6(b) a copy of part 2 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners

7 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6(a) a copy of part 1 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners

7 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4 a copy of the Supreme Court of Georgias order denying Petitio

7 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 a copy of Petitioners application for a certificate of probab

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 a copy of the state habeas courts final order denying relief

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 a copy of Petitioners state habeas corpus petition filed on F

7 #7

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE Of Filing by Nathan Brooks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 a copy of Petitioners state habeas corpus petition filed on February 7, 2018., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 a copy of the state habeas courts final order denying relief on April 19, 2021., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 a copy of Petitioners application for a certificate of probable cause to appeal filed on May 13, 2021., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 a copy of the Supreme Court of Georgias order denying Petitioners application for a certificate of probable cause on November 2, 2021., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 a copy of the Supreme Court of Georgias remittitur issued on December 1, 2021., #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6(a) a copy of part 1 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing., #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6(b) a copy of part 2 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing., #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6(c) a copy of part 3 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing., #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6(d) a copy of part 4 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing., #10 Exhibit Exhibit 6(e) a copy of part 5 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing., #11 Exhibit Exhibit 6(f) a copy of part 6 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing., #12 Exhibit Exhibit 6(g) a copy of part 7 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing. part 1, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 6(g) a copy of part 7 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing. part 2, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 6(g) a copy of part 7 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing. part 3, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 6(g) a copy of part 7 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing. part 4, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 6(h) a copy of part 8 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing., #17 Exhibit Exhibit 6(i) a copy of part 9 (of 9) of the transcript from Petitioners December 17, 2019, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing., #18 Exhibit Exhibit 7 a copy of the Clerks record from Petitioners criminal case., #19 Exhibit Exhibit 8 a copy of the transcript of the hearing on Petitioners motion for new trial., #20 Exhibit Exhibit 9 a copy of the Brief of Appellant from Petitioners direct appeal., #21 Exhibit Exhibit 10 a copy of the decision in Petitioners direct appeal, Thomas v. State, 300 Ga. 433, 796 S.E.2d 242 (2017).)(Crowder, Matthew) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (bnp) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Answer- RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Nathan Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Answer-Response)(Crowder, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Nathan Brooks (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Blackwell Crowder on behalf of Nathan Brooks (Crowder, Matthew) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing via CM/ERR as to Georgia Attorney General (Certified Mail Item No. 9171999991703257185826) and Nathan Brooks (Certified Mail Item No. 9171999991703257185833) re #3 Order. (cmd) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER directing Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to State Attorney General. Respondent is directed to show cause within 30 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/12/2022. (cmd) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jra) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Nathan Brooks. (jra) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Julius Thomas. ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AGANDC-11475491.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Blackwell Crowder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith