This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2021 at 11:29:56 (UTC).

Thomas v. Braithwaite

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Thomas filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Braithwaite. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and JILL A. OTAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00010

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

JILL A. OTAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clifford J. Thomas

Defendant

Kenneth J. Braithwaite

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn A. Luiz

841 Bishop Street, Suite 200, 538-0800, Fax: 524-0010

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Kenneth J. Braithwaite. (jni) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

4 #2

Waiver of the Service of Summons

4 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons

#4

(#4) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

3 #1

Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

#3

(#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30 AM on 3/8/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit Summons

1 #2

Exhibit Jury Demand

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2467960.), filed by Clifford J. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Luiz, Shawn) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#7) EO: At Plaintiff's request to allow additional time to serve the defendants and to allow sufficient time for the government to answer, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 03/08/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 06/04/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD via telephone. Scheduling conference statements are due by 05/28/2021.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#6) EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Kenneth J. Braithwaite. (jni) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30 AM on 3/8/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00010 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2467960.), filed by Clifford J. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Luiz, Shawn) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn A. Luiz(Designation Retained)