This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:14:33 (UTC).

THOMAS v. BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by THOMAS against BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17048

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Zahid N. Quraishi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELMA THOMAS

LENFORD THOMAS

Defendants

WATCHUNG UE LLC

JOHN DOES 1-10 AND/OR XYZ CORPS. 1-10

URBAN EDGE PROPERTIES

BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC.

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) LETTER ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is adjourned to 11/06/2019 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/02/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#10

(#10) Letter from Jorge DeArmas. (BENVENISTI, STEVEN) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

9 #3

Exhibit A - B part 1

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

(#9) First MOTION to Dismiss by BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC., WATCHUNG UE LLC. Responses due by 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - B part 1, #4 Exhibit B part 2 - C)(MCCONNELL, JOHN) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

9 #4

Exhibit B part 2 - C

#8

(#8) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney WILLIAM J. RIINA terminated. Attorney JOHN M. MCCONNELL for WATCHUNG UE LLC added.. (MCCONNELL, JOHN) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. RIINA on behalf of WATCHUNG UE LLC (RIINA, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by EARYN JEDELE EDWARDS on behalf of BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC. (EDWARDS, EARYN) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#4

(#4) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MCCONNELL, JOHN) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting Defendant BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and is hereby extended to 9/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 9/11/2019. (jem) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 #2

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (MCCONNELL, JOHN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/27/2019. (jem) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

1 #1

Statement

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC. from Middlesex, case number MID-L-5518-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9911698), filed by BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Statement, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A-B, #5 Exhibit C Part 1, #6 Exhibit C Part 2, #7 Exhibit C Part 4 - E)(MCCONNELL, JOHN) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) LETTER ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is adjourned to 11/06/2019 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/02/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from Jorge DeArmas. (BENVENISTI, STEVEN) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First MOTION to Dismiss by BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC., WATCHUNG UE LLC. Responses due by 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - B part 1, #4 Exhibit B part 2 - C)(MCCONNELL, JOHN) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney WILLIAM J. RIINA terminated. Attorney JOHN M. MCCONNELL for WATCHUNG UE LLC added.. (MCCONNELL, JOHN) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. RIINA on behalf of WATCHUNG UE LLC (RIINA, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by EARYN JEDELE EDWARDS on behalf of BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC. (EDWARDS, EARYN) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting Defendant BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and is hereby extended to 9/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 9/11/2019. (jem) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #4 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MCCONNELL, JOHN) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/12/2019. (jem) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (MCCONNELL, JOHN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/27/2019. (jem) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jdb) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (jdb) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. The Origin of this case is 2(Removal from State Court), not 1(Original Proceeding). The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: When entering party information remember to change the party role to the correct designation. Plaintiffs, Elma and Lenford Thomas were added as Defendants. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC. from Middlesex, case number MID-L-5518-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9911698), filed by BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Statement, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A-B, #5 Exhibit C Part 1, #6 Exhibit C Part 2, #7 Exhibit C Part 4 - E)(MCCONNELL, JOHN) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.