This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2021 at 08:06:13 (UTC).

Thomas v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Thomas filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Aetna Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01473

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Thomas

Defendant

Aetna Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachary Schmoll

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

9999 Wayzata Blvd.

Minnetonka, MN 55305

Gloria Chi-Ki Lam

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

21 South 11Th Street, Ste 520

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Defendant Attorney

Sara G Janes

Attorney at Chittenden, Murday & Novotny LLC

303 West Madison Street, Suite 2400

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel

#8

(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph R. Jeffery. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8962297 filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Janes, Sara) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara G Janes on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John Thomas. Aetna Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Lam, Gloria) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gloria C. Lam. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8837398 filed by John Thomas. (Schmoll, Zachary) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (CLK) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8836691) filed by John Thomas. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmoll, Zachary) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph R. Jeffery. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8962297 filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Janes, Sara) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara G Janes on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John Thomas. Aetna Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Lam, Gloria) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gloria Chi-Ki Lam for John Thomas. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/25/2021. (NAH) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gloria C. Lam. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8837398 filed by John Thomas. (Schmoll, Zachary) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (CLK) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-1473 PJS/KMM. (CLK) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8836691) filed by John Thomas. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmoll, Zachary) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLORIA CHI-KI LAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary Schmoll